Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC v. UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund

Plaintiff: Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC
Defendant: UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund
Case Number: 1:2018cv06879
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 19 MEMORANDUM by UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 UFCW Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Eskra, Malinda)
December 6, 2018 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Eskra, Malinda)
December 5, 2018 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund by Jonathan D. Karmel (Karmel, Jonathan)
December 4, 2018 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund by L. Katie Mason (Mason, L.)
November 5, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #14 is granted to 12/6/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
November 2, 2018 14 Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Eskra, Malinda) Modified on 11/5/2018 (mgh, ).
November 2, 2018 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund by Malinda J. Eskra (Eskra, Malinda)
November 1, 2018 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund by David G. Hanson (Hanson, David)
October 22, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC by Meredith S. Kirshenbaum (Kirshenbaum, Meredith)
October 22, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions to appear pro hac vice #7 #8 #9 are granted. Scheduling conference set for 1/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 1/22/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
October 19, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15084220. (Halpin, Carly)
October 19, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15080452. (Sabatini, Frank)
October 19, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15080425. (Richman, Ronald)
October 18, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC as to UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Sullivan, Michael)
October 15, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund (pj, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC (Sullivan, Michael)
October 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC by Michael Lawrence Sullivan (Sullivan, Michael)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sullivan, Michael)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15054968. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sullivan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC v. UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick's Finer Foods, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Sullivan
Represented By: Frank Sabatini
Represented By: Meredith S. Kirshenbaum
Represented By: Carly Halpin
Represented By: Ronald E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UFCW Unions & Employers Midwest Pension Fund
Represented By: L. Katie Mason
Represented By: Jonathan D. Karmel
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: David G. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?