Barker v. Vita Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Plaintiff: Terrell Barker
Defendant: VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports and Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv06898
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Agreed motion for extension of time until December 20, 2018 to respond to the complaint #21 is granted. The status hearing set for 12/6/18 is reset to 1/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 26, 2018 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Terrell Barker for extension of time to file response/reply (Shub, Jonathan)
November 12, 2018 20 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Coleman, Gregory)
November 9, 2018 19 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Soffin, Rachel)
November 9, 2018 18 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Carroll, Katrina)
November 9, 2018 17 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Laukaitis, Kevin)
November 9, 2018 16 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Shub, Jonathan)
November 8, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Agreed motion for extension of time until November 26, 2018 to respond to the complaint #13 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 8, 2018 14 Certification Form Mandatory Discovery by Terrell Barker (Suciu, Nick)
November 7, 2018 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Terrell Barker for extension of time to file response/reply (Shub, Jonathan)
November 2, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Barker as to Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Carroll, Katrina)
October 18, 2018 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 12/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 17, 2018 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Nick Suciu, III (Suciu, Nick)
October 16, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Vita Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (lma, )
October 16, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Kevin Laukaitis (Laukaitis, Kevin)
October 16, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan)
October 16, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
October 16, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
October 15, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
October 15, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Rachel Lynn Soffin (Soffin, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrell Barker by Gregory F Coleman (Coleman, Gregory)
October 15, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (ec, )
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shub, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terrell Barker; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15056441. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shub, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Vita Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Barker
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?