Harris v. Crown Mortgage Co

Appellant: Debra Harris
Appellee: Crown Mortgage Co
Trustee: Tom Vaughn
Case Number: 1:2018cv06972
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/7/2018: Before the Court is debtor/appellant Debra Harris's motion for leave to appeal what she deems to be an interlocutory order of the bankruptcy court in her Chapter 13 proceeding. Harris's amended Chapter 13 plan was confirmed on August 20, 2018. Harris seeks leave to appeal the bankruptcy court's order of October 1, 2018, in which the court denied Harris's motion for sanctions against creditor Crown Mortgage Company ("Crown") and explained that Crown was permitted to pursue foreclosure proceedings with respect to Harris's residence because the automatic stay as to that collateral had terminated prior to plan confirmation. It is unclear why Harris characterizes the bankruptcy court's order as interlocutory. In its response brief, Crown contends that the bankruptcy court's order is a final, appealable order. The Court agrees. While the larger bankruptcy case is still pending (the plan calls for Harris to make plan payments for several years), the controversy between Harris and Crown is over because Harris's plan was confirmed. See Bullard v. Blue Hills Bank, 135 S. Ct. 1686, 1692 (2015) ("Confirmation has preclusive effect, foreclosing relitigation of any issue actually litigated by the parties and any issue necessarily determined by the confirmation order.") (internal punctuation and citation omitted); Germeraad v. Powers, 826 F.3d 962, 965 (7th Cir. 2016) (one way of assessing whether an order in a bankruptcy case is final "is to identify whether the order at issue brought to an end a single 'proceeding' that exists within the larger bankruptcy case"). Accordingly, Harris's motion for leave to appeal the bankruptcy court's order #2 is denied as unnecessary. The briefing schedule on the appeal is as follows: debtor/appellant may file an appeal brief by 1/22/2019; appellee may file a response by 2/21/2019; and debtor/appellant may reply by 3/7/2019. The Court will rule electronically. Mailed notice(is, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Crown Mortgage Co to MOTION by Appellant Debra Harris for leave to appeal #2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Bastianen, Peter)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Crown Mortgage Co by Peter C. Bastianen (Bastianen, Peter)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: On Debtor/Appellant's motion for leave to appeal an interlocutory order #2 , response(s) may be filed by 11/19/2018, and Debtor/Appellant may reply by 12/3/2018. The Court directs the parties to explain in their briefs what remains to be adjudicated in the bankruptcy proceeding. The Court will rule electronically. Mailed notice (is, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Matthew Carl Baysinger on behalf of Debra Harris regarding bankruptcy appeal #1 (Baysinger, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Debra Harris by Matthew Carl Baysinger (Baysinger, Matthew)
October 22, 2018 MAILED Copy of Order dated 10/18/18 to Matthew Baysinger. (gcy, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Debtor/appellant's motion for leave to file appeal of interlocutory order #2 does not have a certificate of service attached. Debtor/appellant is directed to serve the U.S. Trustee, Chapter 13 Trustee, and Crown Mortgage Company with a copy of her motion for leave to file appeal and to file the certificate of service on the docket. Mailed notice (is, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Bankruptcy Appeal letter to Attorney(s)of Record. (gcy, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
October 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (acm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION by Appellant Debra Harris for leave to appeal (USBC-Green, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 16893 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Crown Mortgage Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Debra Harris
Represented By: Matthew Carl Baysinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Crown Mortgage Co
Represented By: Peter C. Bastianen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tom Vaughn
Represented By: Mark Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?