Sherdon v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherdon
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07006
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Sherdon by Kimberly May Brancato (Brancato, Kimberly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Sherdon by Michael W. Lenert (Lenert, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Sherdon by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by General Motors LLC(Brunty, Christina)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors LLC by Christina C Brunty (Brunty, Christina)
October 18, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (jjr, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-008890) filed by General Motors LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15079180. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service and Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brunty, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherdon v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherdon
Represented By: Kimberly May Brancato
Represented By: Michael W. Lenert
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Christina C Brunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?