Small v. Stevens

Appellant: Brian Keith Small
Appellee: Patrick S Layng and James E Stevens
Case Number: 1:2018cv07032
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Jorge L Alonso
1 Judge: Iain D Johnston
2 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER from Brian Keith Small dated 12/7/2018. (Exhibits) (pk, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Special Request Of Objection To The Reply Made By The Appellee Stevens Answers by Brian Keith Small (pg, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Appellee James E Stevens to supplement, #8 (Stevens, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SPECIAL REQUEST by Appellant Brian Keith Small of Objection to The United States Trustee's Notice of Non-Participation (lf, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division. Case assigned to Judge Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston for all further proceedings. (jp, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED the case record to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois Division which is located in Rockford, Illinois. (jh, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case was assigned to this Court in error. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, which is located in Rockford, Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/8/2018. Mailed notice (jh, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Patrick S Layng of Non-Participation (Gulden, Cameron)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) Letter). (eaa, )
October 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jjr, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 81397 (Judge Lynch) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brian Keith Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick S Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James E Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?