Williams v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC.

Plaintiff: Marcus Williams
Defendant: RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07038
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RCN Telecom Services, LLC (Kalas, Becky)
December 6, 2018 13 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Marcus Williams (Straw, Shanita)
December 4, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint by RCN Telecom Services, LLC(Kalas, Becky)
November 7, 2018 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/4/2018. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/12/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 12/18/2018 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 11/20/2018 is stricken. (rao, )
November 6, 2018 10 NOTICE of Motion by Becky Lynn Kalas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Kalas, Becky)
November 6, 2018 9 MOTION by Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kalas, Becky)
November 6, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky)
November 6, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig)
October 24, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Williams as to RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Davis, Victoria)
October 23, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
October 22, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC. (acm)
October 22, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (ec, )
October 21, 2018 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Davis, Victoria)
October 19, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Shanita Quintrese Tiny Straw (Straw, Shanita)
October 19, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Victoria Christian Davis (Davis, Victoria)
October 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Williams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15084513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Represented By: Becky Lynn Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Thorstenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Williams
Represented By: Shanita Quintrese Tiny Straw
Represented By: Victoria Christian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?