NHL Enterprises, L.P. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: NHL Enterprises, L.P.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Jennifer Zander, Helen Almaraz, linda lutzen, liuyunkun, Opal Gomez, flfj6101, Ralph Bechtol, Demetrius Kelly, Veronica Reese, Joseph Coleman, Chelsea Logan, Hazel Martin, Mary Ray, xiaoyou328586_9, Joh-Michael Brown, Joe Black, Chelsea (2) Logan, Michael Nicolai, Andrew Joseph, Rebecca Midkiff, Charles Koh, Gerogette Fly, Mary Pagan, zhengjiang zhu, Trish Barber, jinning lin, Jennifer Williams, Lucy Parker, moonbirdring - 0, Paula Wolf, Paul Palliser, Stephen Wieland, liudandan, Chanel Martin, Erica Vogt, Joseph Seidel, Jaclyn Webster, Minnie Keith, Michelle Prusia, chandan, Beverly Rivard, Patrick Obrien, Matthew Reese, Ena Lira, Brian Byrd, Chris Harp, William Shively, Chee Closs, 2cn1234, Bernard Galicia, James Roberts, zhenghui yan and Mae Wolters
Case Number: 1:2018cv07118
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 40 MAILED Trademark report with certified copy of Order dated 12/19/18 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 39 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/19/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
December 19, 2018 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 12/19/2018. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and for default judgment #34 is granted. Enter Order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
December 18, 2018 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
December 14, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #34 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/19/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #34 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/15/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
November 15, 2018 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/15/2018. Plaintiff's motion #28 for preliminary injunction is granted. Plaintiff's oral motion to unseal all sealed documents in this matter is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
November 14, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson Martin)(Martin, Allyson)
November 9, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #28 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/15/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
November 6, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ZHENGJIANG ZHU and all other Defendants identified in the Second Amended Complaint (pj, )
November 5, 2018 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt No.4624213185, posted by NHL Enterprises, L.P. (rc, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 27 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/1/2018. Mailed notice (cn). Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiffs' motion #9 for leave to file instanter a second amended complaint under seal is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #10 and motion for electronic service of process #19 are granted. Plaintiffs' ex parte motion #12 for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the defendant domain names, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery is granted. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (cn).
October 29, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 24 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 , motion for leave to file #9 , motion for temporary restraining order #12 , motion for leave to file #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/1/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 11-14 regarding declaration #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Exhibit 1-12, #3 Exhibit 1-13, #4 Exhibit 1-14)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 1-10 regarding declaration #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7, #8 Exhibit 1-8, #9 Exhibit 1-9, #10 Exhibit 1-10)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Lindsay Conn regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prochnow regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for temporary restraining order , Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 DOCUMENT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for leave to file Instanter a Second Amended Complaint Under Seal (Gaudio, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Letter regarding Rule 83.16 to attorney's of record. (ek, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Trademark request letter to plaintiff's counsel Amy Ziegler. (ek, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15104019. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 DOCUMENT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Document, #2 Document, #3 Document, #4 Document, #5 Document, #6 Document)(jjr, ) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ek, ).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/23/2018. Mailed notice. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NHL Enterprises, L.P. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Zander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Almaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: linda lutzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liuyunkun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opal Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: flfj6101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Bechtol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrius Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiaoyou328586_9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joh-Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea (2) Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Midkiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerogette Fly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhengjiang zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jinning lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moonbirdring - 0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Palliser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liudandan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnie Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Prusia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chandan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Rivard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Obrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ena Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chee Closs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2cn1234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Galicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhenghui yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mae Wolters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHL Enterprises, L.P.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Jessica Lea Bloodgood
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?