Serpentec, Inc. v. Weems Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Serpentec, Inc.
Defendant: Weems Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07146
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' MIDP responses shall be served by 1/30/19. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's counterclaim is extended to 1/30/19. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (Joint Status Report), filed by Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc.. (Schwartz, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as counsel #21 is granted. Attorney Kathryn Ann Feiereisel is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 12/5/18 is stricken. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #21 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Feiereisel, Kathryn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION by Attorney Kathryn A. Feiereisel to withdraw as attorney for Serpentec, Inc., Serpentec, Inc.. No party information provided (Feiereisel, Kathryn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weems Industries, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Caves, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Weems Industries, Inc. against Serpentec, Inc. . by Weems Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Todd)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/20/2018. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted to 12/14/18. Enter Order. Status hearing previously set for 12/12/18 is stricken and reset to 12/19/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/14/18. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Clark Jacobs for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Jacobs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Weems Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Jacobs, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weems Industries, Inc. by David M. Caves (Caves, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weems Industries, Inc. by Todd Clark Jacobs (Jacobs, Todd)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serpentec, Inc. as to Weems Industries, Inc. on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Feiereisel, Kathryn)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 12/12/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (sxb, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
October 25, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Weems Industries, Inc. (yt)
October 25, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by James John Saul (Saul, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent or Trademark by Serpentec, Inc. (Feiereisel, Kathryn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Kathryn Ann Feiereisel (Feiereisel, Kathryn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Serpentec, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Serpentec, Inc. by Daniel Joel Schwartz (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Serpentec, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15105877. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serpentec, Inc. v. Weems Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weems Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Caves
Represented By: Todd Clark Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serpentec, Inc.
Represented By: James John Saul
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Feiereisel
Represented By: Daniel Joel Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?