United States of America v. Aux Sable Liquid Products LP
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES and United States of America
Defendant: Aux Sable Liquid Products LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv07198
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT DECREE Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/21/2018. Mailed notice(mjc, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Motion hearing held. Case called. No one objected to entry of the consent decree. For the reasons stated on the record, the court finds that the consent decree is reasonable, consistent with the statutory goals, and substantively and procedurally fair. The unopposed motion of the United States to enter consent decree #7 is granted. Enter Consent Decree. No appearance is required on 1/11/19. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Randall M. Stone for presentment of motion to approve consent judgment #7 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Stone, Randall)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to approve consent judgment - Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree (Stone, Randall)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Randall M. Stone (Stone, Randall)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Ashleigh Graham Morris (Morris, Ashleigh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aux Sable Liquid Products LP by David Michael Loring (Loring, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aux Sable Liquid Products LP by Francis Xavier Lyons (Lyons, Francis)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Status hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2325. If, by the date of the scheduled status hearing, defendant has not been served, plaintiff should call the courtroom deputy (312-435-5641) to request a new status date. No status hearing should be held until all defendants have been served. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Pursuant to LR 5.2(f), a stapled and/or bound paper copy of all electronically filed pleadings, including the complaint, must be delivered to chambers (2356) within one business day of filing. Noncompliance with LR 5.2(f) will result in the imposition of a $200.00 fine payable to the Clerk of the Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/30/2018. Mailed notice(mjc, )
October 29, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit Consent Decree)(Morris, Ashleigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Aux Sable Liquid Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aux Sable Liquid Products LP
Represented By: David Michael Loring
Represented By: Francis Xavier Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Ashleigh Graham Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Randall M. Stone
Represented By: Ashleigh Graham Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?