Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance v. Hebron Express Company et al

Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance
Defendant: Abel Mehari and Hebron Express Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv07287
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko for presentment of motion for entry of default #10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lesko, Christina)
December 20, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Christina J. Lesko regarding motion for entry of default #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lesko, Christina)
December 20, 2018 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance for entry of default (Lesko, Christina)
November 26, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance as to Hebron Express Company on 11/23/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Lesko, Christina)
November 19, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance as to Abel Mehari on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Lesko, Christina)
November 7, 2018 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 2, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
November 2, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Hebron Express Company, Abel Mehari (ec, )
November 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
November 1, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance by Robert Edward Browne, Jr (Browne, Robert)
November 1, 2018 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance re complaint, #1 (Lesko, Christina)
November 1, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance by Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko (Lesko, Christina)
November 1, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lesko, Christina)
November 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15131035. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through O)(Lesko, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance v. Hebron Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel Mehari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebron Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medellion Finance
Represented By: Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko
Represented By: Robert Edward Browne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?