Waukegan Port District v. North Shore Gas Company
Plaintiff: Waukegan Port District
Defendant: North Shore Gas Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv07312
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #22 is stricken without prejudice to renewal if appropriate after the Court rules on the pending motion for remand for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Court denies defendant's request to set a briefing schedule on the motion to dismiss at this time. The motion hearing set for 12/13/2018 is stricken, and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by North Shore Gas Company in support of motion to dismiss #22 (Kennedy, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by John Francis Kennedy for presentment of motion to dismiss #22 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Kennedy, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant North Shore Gas Company to dismiss (Kennedy, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The parties' joint motion for a modified briefing schedule and stay of Rule 26 obligations #19 is granted. The modified briefing schedule as to Plaintiff's motion to remand #13 is as follows: Defendant's response due by 1/4/2019. Reply due by 1/25/2019. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearing noticed for 12/11/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by John Francis Kennedy for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Kennedy, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant North Shore Gas Company The Parties' [JOINT] Motion for a Modified Briefing Schedule and Stay of Rule 26 Obligations (Kennedy, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The briefing schedule as to Plaintiff's motion to remand #13 is as follows: Defendant's response due by 12/27/2018. Reply due by 1/11/2019. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearing noticed for 12/12/2018 and initial status hearing set for 12/12/2018 are stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Waukegan Port District re other #16 Corrected Exhibit A (Parr, Ashley)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 Corrected Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand [Docket Entry 14] by Waukegan Port District (Parr, Ashley)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Ashley Elizabeth Parr for presentment of motion to remand #13 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Parr, Ashley)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Waukegan Port District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parr, Ashley)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Waukegan Port District to remand (Parr, Ashley)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Waukegan Port District by Joseph Francis Madonia (Madonia, Joseph)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Waukegan Port District by Alan Bruce White (White, Alan)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Waukegan Port District by Ashley Elizabeth Parr (Parr, Ashley)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise plead is extended until 12/6/2018. Motion hearing noticed for 11/8/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Erin Babbitt for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Babbitt, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant North Shore Gas Company for extension of time Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Babbitt, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant North Shore Gas Company by Elizabeth Erin Babbitt (Babbitt, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by North Shore Gas Company (Kennedy, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant North Shore Gas Company by Allison Emma Czerniak (Czerniak, Allison)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant North Shore Gas Company by John Francis Kennedy (Kennedy, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kennedy, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of The Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, Lake County, Illinois, case number (18 L 779) filed by North Shore Gas Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15135313. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, w/Ex. List)(Kennedy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waukegan Port District v. North Shore Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Gas Company
Represented By: Allison Emma Czerniak
Represented By: John Francis Kennedy
Represented By: Elizabeth Erin Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waukegan Port District
Represented By: Joseph Francis Madonia
Represented By: Alan Bruce White
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?