James v. Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois et al

Petitioner: Najee Devonte James
Respondent: Cook County, Illinois, Kimberly M. Foxx and Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2018cv07347
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Najee Devonte James in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 12/24/18) (lf, )
December 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: The Court denies Petitioner's motion for leave to file in forma pauperis #3 without prejudice to reconsideration should he renew his motion in compliance with this order. Petitioner is given until January 7, 2019, to either to file an in forma pauperis application on the enclosed form with the information required by 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(2) or to pay the $5.00 filing fee. If Petitioner takes no action by that date, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to: (1) terminate Cook County, Illinois, and Kimberly M. Foxx as Respondents; (2) add Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois as Respondent; and, (3) alter the case caption to James v. Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/6/2018. Mailed notice (tt, )
November 5, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Najee Devonte James for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, )
November 5, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (tt, )
November 5, 2018 1 RECEIVED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and no copies by Najee Devonte James. (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 11/1/18) (tt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kimberly M. Foxx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Najee Devonte James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?