Direct Media Power, Inc. et al v. Radio One, Inc.

Appellant: Dean Tucci and Direct Media Power, Inc.
Appellee: Radio One, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07397
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 12/11/18. Plaintiff-Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file brief #7 is granted. Appellant's initial brief shall be by 1/28/19 and is limited to 25 pages. Appellee's response brief due by 2/25/19 and is limited to 25 pages. Appellant's reply brief due by 3/18/19 and is limited to 15 pages. Ruling to be by mailMailed notice (ca, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by John H. Ray, III for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Ray, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Appellants Direct Media Power, Inc., Dean Tucci for extension of time to file initial brief (Ray, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Appellant's initial brief shall be by 12/7/18. Appellee's response brief due by 12/28/18. Appellant's reply brief due by 1/18/19. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Radio One, Inc. by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellants Direct Media Power, Inc., Dean Tucci by John H. Ray, III (Ray, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Appearance Form) (tt, )
November 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 B 36934 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Direct Media Power, Inc. et al v. Radio One, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dean Tucci
Represented By: John H. Ray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Direct Media Power, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Ray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Radio One, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?