Lucas v. Bonine et al

Plaintiff: William Michael Lucas
Defendant: Brent Bonine, John Baldwin, Mr Lambert and Mr Cocoa
Case Number: 1:2018cv07409
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2019 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff William Michael Lucas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 12/28/2018)(ek, )
December 7, 2018 MAILED to Plaintiff a copy of order dated 12/7/2018 and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (pk, )
December 7, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied as stale. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this litigation, by January 9, 2019, Plaintiff must: either (a) submit a completed in forma pauperis application that complies with the instructions below, or (b) pre-pay the full $400.00 statutory filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the foregoing instructions, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Review of Plaintiff's complaint is deferred, pending resolution of the filing fee issue. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice. (pk, )
November 8, 2018 5 LETTER from William Michael Lucas dated 11/1/2018. (nsf, )
November 8, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff William Michael Lucas for attorney representation. (nsf, )
November 8, 2018 3 MOTION by Plaintiff William Michael Lucas And Affidavit to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
November 8, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
November 8, 2018 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by William Michael Lucas. (Envelope post marked 11/2/2018) (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Bonine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Bonine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Cocoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Michael Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?