Jerod-Bey v. Chicago Police Supervisor Of 79th and Halsted Location et al

Plaintiff: A: Jerod-Bey
Defendant: Arresting Officers #1 (Female) (79th and Halsted/Morning Of Incident), Arresting Officer #2 (Male) (79th and Halsted/Morning Of Incident), Chicago Police Lead Investigation Dept Officer (79th and Halsted) and Chicago Police Supervisor Of 79th and Halsted Location
Case Number: 1:2018cv07415
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 8 NOTICE by A: Jerod-Bey of Change of Address. (Envelope Postmarked 12/26/2018) (jh, )
December 11, 2018 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff A: Jerod-Bey for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 12/7/2018) (ph, )
November 19, 2018 MAILED copy of order dated 11/16/18 and a blank application to proceed in forma paupris to Plaintiff. (lf, )
November 16, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's trust fund statements showing all transactions in his account or accounts for the six-month period immediately preceding the date he responds to this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by December 14, 2018, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 11/16/2018. Mailed notice (lf, )
November 8, 2018 5 LETTER from A: Jerod-Bey dated October 31, 2018. (ph, )
November 8, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff A: Jerod-Bey for attorney representation. (ph, )
November 8, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff A: Jerod-Bey for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (ph, )
November 8, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, )
November 8, 2018 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by A: Jerod-Bey. (Attachments: #1 (Envelope not postmarked)) (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerod-Bey v. Chicago Police Supervisor Of 79th and Halsted Location et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arresting Officers #1 (Female) (79th and Halsted/Morning Of Incident)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arresting Officer #2 (Male) (79th and Halsted/Morning Of Incident)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Lead Investigation Dept Officer (79th and Halsted)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Supervisor Of 79th and Halsted Location
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A: Jerod-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?