Tate et al v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Legend Booth, E'Monie Booth, Ebony Tate, La'Niya Booth, Cynthia Eason, LaKai'ya Booth, L.B. (2), L.B. (3), L.B. (1) and E.B.
Defendant: Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, Michael Higgins, City of Chicago, Joshua Champion, Matthew Fetzer, Patrick Boyle, Hector Villanueva, Michael Fleming, Peter Jonas, Christopher Decanto, Justin Raether, Piotr Nestorowicz, Luis Molina, Kenneth Kendal, William Murphy, Charles Rhein, Jeffrey Lawson, Rafael Lopez, Elvis Turcinovic, Unknown Chicago Police officers, Phillip Renault, John Foertsch, Michael Sebastian, Kenneth Adair, Matthew Evans, (star #17762), Jorge Heredia, Patrick Kennedy and John Hroma, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07439
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant Officers' and City of Chicago's agreed motion enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead by 2/14/2019 #45 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/10/2019 is reset to 2/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 1/8/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 46 AGREED - NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, #45 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
January 3, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION by Defendants Kenneth Adair, Patrick Boyle, Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, Joshua Champion, City of Chicago, Christopher Decanto, Matthew Evans, Matthew Fetzer, Michael Fleming, John Foertsch, Jorge Heredia, Michael Higgins, John Hroma, Jr, Peter Jonas, Kenneth Kendal, Patrick Kennedy, Jeffrey Lawson, Rafael Lopez, Luis Molina, William Murphy, Piotr Nestorowicz, Justin Raether, Phillip Renault, Charles Rhein, Michael Sebastian, Elvis Turcinovic, Hector Villanueva for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint,, #17 - Defendant Officers' and City of Chicago's Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
December 20, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Hector Villanueva on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Elvis Turcinovic on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Michael Sebastian on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Charles Rhein on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Phillip Renault on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Justin Raether on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Piotr Nestorowicz on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to William Murphy on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Luis Molina on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Rafael Lopez on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Jeffrey Lawson on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Patrick Kennedy on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Kenneth Kendal on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Peter Jonas on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to John Hroma, Jr on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Jorge Heredia on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to John Foertsch on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Michael Fleming on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Matthew Fetzer on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Matthew Evans on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Christopher Decanto on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Joshua Champion on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Patrick Boyle on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B., Ebony Tate, Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), L.B. (3), L.B. (2) as to Kenneth Adair on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, Michael Higgins by Megan Kathleen Monaghan (Monaghan, Megan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, Michael Higgins by Matthew P Dixon (Dixon, Matthew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, Michael Higgins by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
December 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kenneth Adair, Patrick Boyle, Joshua Champion, Christopher Decanto, Matthew Evans, Matthew Fetzer, Michael Fleming, John Foertsch, Jorge Heredia, John Hroma Jr., Peter Jonas, Patrick Kennedy, Kenneth Kendal, Jeffrey Lawson, Rafael Lopez, Luis Molina, William Murphy, Piotr Nestorowicz, Justin Raether, Phillip Renault, Charles Rhein, Michael Sebastian, Elvis Turcinovic, Hector Villanueva (yt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED complaint by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (3), Ebony Tate, L.B. (2) against Patrick Boyle, Matthew Evans, Michael Fleming, John Foertsch, P. KENNEDY (NO. 14414), Jeffrey Lawson, Kenneth Adair, Joshua Champion, Christopher Decanto, Matthew Fetzer, Jorge Heredia, John Hroma, Peter Jonas, Kenneth Kendal, Rafael Lopez, Luis Molina, William Murphy, Piotr Nestorowicz, Justin Raether, Phillip Renault, Charles Rhein, Michael Sebastian, Elvis Turcinovic, Hector Villanueva (Hofeld, Al)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Marion Claire Moore (Moore, Marion)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is denied as moot. Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed amended motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 1/14/2019 #12 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/10/2019 is reset to 1/17/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 11/29/2018 is stricken, no appearance id required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Christine Keeyeh Wee for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/29/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Wee, Christine)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Wee, Christine)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Christine Keeyeh Wee for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/29/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Wee, Christine) (Linked document has the incorrect case number) (sxb, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Wee, Christine) (Linked document has the incorrect case number) (sxb, ).
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Christine Keeyeh Wee (Wee, Christine)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 1/10/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (3), Ebony Tate, L.B. (2) as to Michael Higgins on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Hofeld, Al)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (3), Ebony Tate, L.B. (2) as to James D. Cascone on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Hofeld, Al)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (3), Ebony Tate, L.B. (2) as to Jennifer Burmistrz on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Hofeld, Al)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (2), Ebony Tate, L.B. (3) as to City of Chicago on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Hofeld, Al) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/13/2018 (ph, ).
November 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jennifer Burmistrz, James D. Cascone, City of Chicago, Michael Higgins. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs E.B., L.B. (1), L.B. (2), L.B. (3), Cynthia Eason, Ebony Tate by Al Hofeld, Jr (Hofeld, Al) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/13/2018 (ph, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hofeld, Al)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cynthia Eason, L.B. (1), E.B., L.B. (2), Ebony Tate, L.B. (3); Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15164265.(Hofeld, Al) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/13/2018 (ph, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate et al v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Burmistrz
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Cascone
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Higgins
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Marion Claire Moore
Represented By: Raoul Vertick Mowatt
Represented By: Christine Keeyeh Wee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Champion
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Fetzer
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Boyle
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Villanueva
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Jonas
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Decanto
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Raether
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piotr Nestorowicz
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Molina
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kendal
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Murphy
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rhein
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lawson
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Lopez
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvis Turcinovic
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Renault
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Foertsch
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sebastian
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Adair
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Evans
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (star #17762)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Heredia
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Kennedy
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hroma, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legend Booth
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E'Monie Booth
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Tate
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Niya Booth
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Eason
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKai'ya Booth
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B. (2)
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B. (3)
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B. (1)
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?