Moreland et al v. Club 390 Corp.

Plaintiff: Sara Underwood, Jessica Rockwell, Hillary Hepner, Lina Posada, Denise Milani, Ina Schnitzer, Ana Cheri Moreland, Brittany Wilcox and Tara Leigh Patrick
Defendant: Club 390 Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07441
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan L. Schwartz for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Club 390 Corp. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Hillary Hepner, Denise Milani, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Sara Underwood, Brittany Wilcox (Golaszewski, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Hillary Hepner, Denise Milani, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Sara Underwood, Brittany Wilcox by John Vincent Golaszewski (Golaszewski, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 Certfication by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Hillary Hepner, Denise Milani, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Sara Underwood, Brittany Wilcox (Casas, Joseph)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time until January 7, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan L. Schwartz for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Club 390 Corp. for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Schwartz, Jonathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Club 390 Corp. by Justin David Kaplan (Kaplan, Justin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Club 390 Corp. by Jonathan L. Schwartz (Schwartz, Jonathan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Milani, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Brittany Wilcox, Sara Underwood, Hillary Hepner, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick as to Club 390 Corp. on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Casas, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/22/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Trademark letter to Attorney Joseph Casas counsel of record for Plaintiff. (smm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
November 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Club 390 Corp. (yt)
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Hillary Hepner, Denise Milani, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Sara Underwood, Brittany Wilcox by Joseph N Casas (Casas, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casas, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Denise Milani, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Brittany Wilcox, Sara Underwood, Hillary Hepner, Ana Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15165025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Casas, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreland et al v. Club 390 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rockwell
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Hepner
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Schnitzer
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Wilcox
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club 390 Corp.
Represented By: Justin David Kaplan
Represented By: Jonathan L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?