PopSockets LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", fangxiping, OGE INTL, Guangzhou K8 trade, hotwav official store, Strethold, High quality fashion store, Running on sunshine, WannaME, vbhjfweui, Yiwu Giftline Import & Export Co., Ltd., xuejiao120408, zhangkaidede, chongge, TONICHELLA, shenzhenmeimaozhongkejiyouxiangongsi, 19920317hf, male, girlfriend of a mobile phone, TheStarHope226, Mr.Best, EFOUR ChinaMarsCarCare Store, sunnybj, haihua2017, gold_way, zonecy 3C Store, Jimmyzhen2016, fujian5411236, M&T Technology Co. Ltd, wenzhouxiaolu, beyongash, Cheerful Days, BeyondStore, China wooden & educational toys, LiuQiongYang, changhongbin, YTLYT, MARTINS HOUSe, malibustore, SawingSUN, Tina Tina, GHBeauty, xuemeiaini, Theresurprise, CHOSEN1, meimeibaishistore, flyingleap, YZYWAY, huiming2016store, wlweng, xilongzhang, FullTimeStore, Comebuy technology, Meiyudi store Store, Just On, LONGsong, lukunhao, FOLOME, xinwangfengstore, brovero, annamohome, happykobe, chuangkeshuma, Asia Trading, sh&LL, haphaodeyangziyiqu, xuechenming, Suntaiho Speciality Store, violet_house, hcerman, nfh officialflagship store, Fu Yue Zong, fujinliang, xiuhuawang2, zhonghangshuma, LIYUANXIY, hngcyouth0112, Mobile Phone Accessaries Store and Mengna06
Case Number: 1:2018cv07444
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2018 35 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/12/2018. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 12, 2018 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held. Motion for preliminary injunction #29 is granted. Enter Order. Oral motion to unseal documents is granted. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal the amended complaint #8 and Exhibit 1 thereto [8-1], Schedule A to the Complaint #7 and the Amended Complaint [8-2], Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Kelly Frazier #13 , and the TRO #21 . Status hearing originally set for 2/12/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/22/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 11, 2018 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
December 11, 2018 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PopSockets LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson Martin)(Martin, Allyson)
December 7, 2018 31 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #29 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
December 7, 2018 30 MEMORANDUM by PopSockets LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #29 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
December 7, 2018 29 MOTION by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
December 6, 2018 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PopSockets LLC as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
November 30, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Yiwu Giftline Import & Export Co., Ltd. and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (jjr, )
November 26, 2018 27 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ $10,000 posted by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC (lf, )
November 26, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/26/2018, Mailed notice (ags, )
November 26, 2018 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #22 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/28/2018 is stricken. Enter Order. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 20, 2018 24 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #22 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 20, 2018 23 MEMORANDUM by PopSockets LLC in support of extension of time #22 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 20, 2018 22 MOTION by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
November 14, 2018 21 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/14/2018. Mailed notice (ags, ) Modified on 12/18/2018 (gcy, ).
November 14, 2018 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted; Motion for TRO #9 is granted; Motion for electronic service #14 is granted. Enter sealed temporary restraining order. Motion hearing dates of 11/28/2018 are stricken. Initial status hearing is set for 2/12/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 13, 2018 19 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for miscellaneous relief #14 , motion for temporary restraining order #9 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 18 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by PopSockets LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by PopSockets LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 15 MEMORANDUM by PopSockets LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 14 MOTION by Plaintiff PopSockets LLCfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 13 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC regarding declaration #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-1, #2 Exhibit 4-2, #3 Exhibit 4-3)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/18/2018 (gcy, ).
November 13, 2018 12 DECLARATION of Kelly Frazier regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 11 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM by PopSockets LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #9 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 9 MOTION by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
November 13, 2018 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/18/2018 (gcy, ).
November 13, 2018 7 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 9, 2018 6 MOTION by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC for leave to file under seal (Ziegler, Amy)
November 9, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
November 9, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ziegler, Amy)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by PopSockets LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15165488. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Ziegler, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PopSockets LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fangxiping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGE INTL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou K8 trade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hotwav official store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strethold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High quality fashion store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Running on sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WannaME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vbhjfweui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Giftline Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xuejiao120408
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhangkaidede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chongge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONICHELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzhenmeimaozhongkejiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19920317hf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: male
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: girlfriend of a mobile phone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TheStarHope226
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr.Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFOUR ChinaMarsCarCare Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sunnybj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haihua2017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gold_way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zonecy 3C Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmyzhen2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fujian5411236
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Technology Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wenzhouxiaolu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beyongash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheerful Days
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BeyondStore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China wooden & educational toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiuQiongYang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: changhongbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YTLYT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTINS HOUSe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: malibustore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SawingSUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Tina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHBeauty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xuemeiaini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresurprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOSEN1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: meimeibaishistore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: flyingleap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YZYWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huiming2016store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wlweng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xilongzhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FullTimeStore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comebuy technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meiyudi store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just On
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONGsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lukunhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xinwangfengstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brovero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annamohome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: happykobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chuangkeshuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asia Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sh&LL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haphaodeyangziyiqu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xuechenming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntaiho Speciality Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: violet_house
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hcerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nfh officialflagship store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fu Yue Zong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fujinliang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiuhuawang2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhonghangshuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIYUANXIY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hngcyouth0112
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Phone Accessaries Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mengna06
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?