Casken v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Casken
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv07453
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Hartzler, Alex)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The federal in forma pauperis statute, 28 U.S.C. 1915, is designed to ensure indigent litigants meaningful access to the federal courts while simultaneously preventing indigent litigants from filing frivolous, malicious, or repetitive lawsuits. Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 324 (1989). Before authorizing a litigant to proceed in forma pauperis, the Court must make two determinations: first, the Court must determine that the litigant is unable to pay the $400 filing fee; and, second, the Court must determine that the action is neither frivolous nor malicious, does not fail to state a claim, and does not seek money damages against a defendant immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), (e). The first determination is made through a review of the litigants assets as stated in an affidavit submitted to the Court; the second is made by looking to the plaintiffs allegations. Here, Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied for two reasons. First, the application is incomplete; Plaintiff failed to provide a complete response in question 2(B) and failed to provide any response to questions 10 and 11. Second, the application indicates that Plaintiff's spouse earns $3,000 per month, and such income makes Plaintiff ineligible for in forma pauperis status. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case he must pay the $400 filing fee. Because Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate indigence, the Court also denies his motion for attorney representation #5 . See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1); see also Navejar v. Iyiola, 718 F.3d 692, 696 (7th Cir. 2013)(the discretion to recruit counsel is reserved for indigent defendants). If Plaintiff fails to pay the Court's filing fee by 12/21/18, this case will be summarily dismissed. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Ronald S. Casken for attorney representation (pk, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ronald S. Casken for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pk, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ronald S. Casken (pk, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Ronald S. Casken. (Exhibits) (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casken v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Alex Harms Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Casken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?