Wagner v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Peter Charles Wagner
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv07461
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Erin Elaine Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Kelly, Erin)
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchison, Roger)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Charles Wagner by Roger Sanford Hutchison (Hutchison, Roger)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Peter Charles Wagner; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15168314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hutchison, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Charles Wagner
Represented By: Roger Sanford Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Erin Elaine Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?