Hancock et al v. R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trustee Terry Barnett, Trustee Terrence J. Hancock, Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund, Trustee William H. Collins, Trustee David M. Snelten, Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731, Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund, Trustee Dale A. Bolt, Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund, Trustee John J. Lisner, Dale A. Bolt, Terry Barnett, Terrence J. Hancock, John J. Lisner, William H. Collins and David M. Snelten
Defendant: R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07466
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At defendant's request, the time for the 1/8/2019 status hearing is moved to 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 4, 2019 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Barnett, John J. Lisner, Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731, Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund, David M. Snelten, Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund, Dale A. Bolt, Terrence J. Hancock, Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund, William H. Collins as to R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc. on 1/1/2019, answer due 1/22/2019. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
January 2, 2019 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc. by Robert A. Habib (Habib, Robert)
December 16, 2018 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) & (c) on 1/8/2019 at 9:30 a.m. and directs plaintiff's attorney to advise each defendant or its counsel of record in writing of the status hearing date. (mk)
November 13, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terry Barnett, Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Terrence J. Hancock, Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731, Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund, John J. Lisner, Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund, David M. Snelten, Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund by Laura M. Finnegan (Finnegan, Laura)
November 9, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terry Barnett, Dale A. Bolt, William H. Collins, Terrence J. Hancock, Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731, Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund, John J. Lisner, Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund, David M. Snelten, Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Scanlon, Cecilia)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terry Barnett, John J. Lisner, Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731, Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund, David M. Snelten, Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund, Dale A. Bolt, Terrence J. Hancock, Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund, William H. Collins; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15168675.(Scanlon, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock et al v. R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Terry Barnett
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Terrence J. Hancock
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 731, I.B. of T., Excavators and Pavers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee William H. Collins
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee David M. Snelten
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health and Welfare Fund of the Excavating, Grading and Asphalt Craft Local No. 731
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 731 Educational/Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Dale A. Bolt
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor/Management Cooperation Committee Task Force Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee John J. Lisner
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale A. Bolt
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Barnett
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence J. Hancock
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Lisner
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Collins
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Snelten
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. & R. Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?