Hall v. MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC.

Plaintiff: Stephen F. Hall
Defendant: MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07467
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #13 to file a responsive pleading is granted to 1/9/2019. Plaintiff's motion for default order and judgment #8 is entered and continued to 2/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is required on 1/7/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
January 2, 2019 14 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Lindsey A.L. Conley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Conley, Lindsey)
January 2, 2019 13 MOTION by Defendant MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC. for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Conley, Lindsey)
January 2, 2019 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC. by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey)
January 2, 2019 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC. by Nabil G. Foster (Foster, Nabil)
December 28, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM by Stephen F. Hall in support of motion for default judgment #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tomei, Robert)
December 28, 2018 9 NOTICE of Motion by Robert J Tomei, Jr for presentment of motion for default judgment #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Tomei, Robert)
December 28, 2018 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Stephen F. Hall for default judgment as to MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC (Tomei, Robert)
December 10, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen F. Hall as to MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC. on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Tomei, Robert)
December 4, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 2/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report due 2/15/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 26, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Stephen F. Hall regarding Summons, Complaint with jury demand, documetn preservation demand, notice of lien and assignment, U.S. District court for the Northern District of Illinois Attorney Appearance Form, Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery, Standing Order Regarding MIDP, MIDP Checklist served on Derek Hacket c/o CT Corporation System as Authorized Agent on November 16, 2018 (Tomei, Robert)
November 13, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 13, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC. (acm)
November 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
November 9, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stephen F. Hall by Robert J Tomei, Jr (Tomei, Robert)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tomei, Robert)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen F. Hall; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15168769.(Tomei, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen F. Hall
Represented By: Robert J Tomei, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MiraMed Revenue Group, LLC.
Represented By: Lindsey A.L. Conley
Represented By: Nabil G. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?