Cora v. Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Trina R. Cora
Defendant: Peter Lebron, Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC and John Grodoski
Case Number: 1:2018cv07468
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2019 11 NOTICE of Motion by Roxana M Underwood for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Underwood, Roxana)
January 4, 2019 10 MOTION by Defendant Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Agreed Motion) (Underwood, Roxana)
November 21, 2018 9 Disclosure of Corporate Ownership STATEMENT by Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Underwood, Roxana)
November 21, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Grodoski, Peter Lebron, Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC by Roxana M Underwood (Underwood, Roxana)
November 21, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Grodoski, Peter Lebron, Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC by Robert James Smith, Jr (Smith, Robert)
November 20, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 1/25/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 1/31/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (rao, )
November 19, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trina R. Cora. All Defendants. (Krauchun, Kelly)
November 14, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trina R. Cora by Kelly Ann Krauchun (Krauchun, Kelly)
November 13, 2018 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herbert, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trina R. Cora; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15169036. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Herbert, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cora v. Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lebron
Represented By: Roxana M Underwood
Represented By: Robert James Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tootsie Roll Mfg, LLC
Represented By: Roxana M Underwood
Represented By: Robert James Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Grodoski
Represented By: Roxana M Underwood
Represented By: Robert James Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina R. Cora
Represented By: Daniel Q Herbert
Represented By: Kelly Ann Krauchun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?