Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07536
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MAILED Patent report with certified copy of minute order dated 12/21/2018 #11 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (sxb, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Notice of Dismissal filed on 12/13/2018 #10 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Internet Media Interactive Corp. NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE (Haller, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 1/10/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Internet Media Interactive Corp. as to Lifeway Foods, Inc. on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Haller, Timothy)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, )
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lifeway Foods, Inc. (yt)
November 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. by Timothy J. Haller (Haller, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 PLAINTIFFS LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENT by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haller, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15177234. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?