Mulkanoor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Appellant: Premsagar Mulkanoor
Case Number: 1:2018cv07575
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, status hearing set for 1/16/2019 #8 is stricken and re-set for 2/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 2/14/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 17, 2018 9 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal, #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
November 30, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: At the parties' request, status hearing set for 12/6/2018 #3 is stricken and re-set to 1/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file their joint status report by 1/9/2019. Mailed notice (cn). Modified on 12/3/2018 (jlj, ).
November 20, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Premsagar Mulkanoor by Lindsey Louise Purdy (Purdy, Lindsey)
November 20, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Premsagar Mulkanoor by Ariel Weissberg (Weissberg, Ariel)
November 20, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by William Silas Hackney [AMENDED] (Hackney, William)
November 20, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by William Silas Hackney (Hackney, William)
November 16, 2018 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By 11/30/2018, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a briefing schedule for this appeal. Status hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 16, 2018 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 rule 8316 ltr)(pk, )
November 15, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
November 15, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 17 A 349 (Judge Schmetterer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Adv Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulkanoor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Maria A Diakoumakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: William Silas Hackney
Represented By: Maria A Diakoumakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Premsagar Mulkanoor
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Represented By: Lindsey Louise Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?