Quitno v. General Motors, LLC.
Plaintiff: Amber Quitno
Defendant: General Motors, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07598
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Frederick J Kapala
2 Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Defendant's motion to file an oversized brief #21 , not to exceed 25 pages, is unopposed and granted. Defendant's answer remains due on 1/25/2019. (yxp, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant General Motors, LLC. for leave to file excess pages (Levine, Jared)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors, LLC. by Jared Alexander Levine (Levine, Jared)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors, LLC. by Kathleen Taylor Sooy (Sooy, Kathleen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by attorneys Kathleen Sooy #13 and Jared Levine #14 and #17 are granted. Ms. Sooy and Mr. Levine shall file their appearances by 12/18/2018. (yxp, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15284830. Revised to reflect court admissions of Jared A. Levine (Levine, Jared)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Attorney Jared Levine filed a motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 , but did not list the courts in which he is a member in good standing and eligible to practice. Mr. Levine's revised motion shall be filed by 12/18/2018. (yxp, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The defendant's motion for an extension of time #12 is unopposed and granted. The defendant's answer is now due 1/25/2019. The initial status hearing previously set for 1/17/2019 is stricken and is reset to 1/31/2019 at 9:00 AM. The joint initial written status report is now due 1/25/2019. (yxp, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15280815. (Levine, Jared)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15280688. (Sooy, Kathleen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Brunty, Christina) Modified on 12/17/2018 (yxp, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors, LLC. by Christina C Brunty (Brunty, Christina)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Quitno as to General Motors, LLC. on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephan, Ryan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Quitno by Michael J Flannery (Flannery, Michael)
November 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant General Motors, LLC. (jn, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 1/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 1/11/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division. Case assigned to Judge Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston for all further proceedings. (jp, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED the case record to the Western Division. (nsf, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The clerk shall transfer this case to Rockford, Illinois, forthwith. This case was inadvertently filed in this district. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/16/2018. Mailed notice (nsf, )
November 16, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Quitno by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Quitno by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephan, Ryan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amber Quitno; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15187932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stephan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quitno v. General Motors, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Quitno
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Michael J Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC.
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Christina C Brunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?