Vlahakis-Hanks v. Vlahakis et al
Petitioner: Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks
Respondent: Elli Manolas and John Vlahakis
Case Number: 1:2018cv07607
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Elli Manolas, Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks (Rechtoris, Kenneth)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Petitioner Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks regarding Summons, Complaint with Exs. A-E served on John Vlahakis on 12-08-2018 (Rechtoris, Kenneth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks (Rechtoris, Kenneth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Elli Manolas by David E Lieberman (Lieberman, David)
November 30, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Respondent John Vlahakis (jjr, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 16, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks by Kenneth E. Rechtoris (Rechtoris, Kenneth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rechtoris, Kenneth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-15188181. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rechtoris, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlahakis-Hanks v. Vlahakis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elli Manolas
Represented By: David E Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelly Vlahakis-Hanks
Represented By: Kenneth E. Rechtoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?