Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78
Case Number: 1:2018cv07657
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant John Doe's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously #14 is granted. Motion hearing set for 1/15/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Kathryn Russell for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #14 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Russell, Erin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78For Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Russell, Erin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry (Corrected) before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 1/3/2019 and continued for 2/14/2019. Please disregard Docket #16 , it was entered in error. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 1/3/2019. Amended Complaint shall be filed by 1/17/2019. Status hearing set for 2/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to serve a third party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference #7 is granted. Motion hearing set for 12/4/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/4/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/20/2018. (sxb, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (sxb, )
November 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15192517. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.173.69.78
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?