Fatoki v. Stearns

Appellant: Adeyemi Fatoki
Appellee: Glenn B. Stearns
Case Number: 1:2018cv07667
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
December 17, 2018 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Trnasmittal Letter ROA, #2 BK Docket Sheet)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
November 29, 2018 4 Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal by Adeyemi Fatoki (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing and Proof of Service, #2 Statement of Issues to be Presented)(Tyler, Timothy)
November 28, 2018 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Briefing will proceed pursuant to the schedule set by Rule 8018. Appellant's brief is due within 30 days after docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically. Appellee's brief is due within 30 days after service of appellant's brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 14 days after service of appellee's brief. A status hearing is set for 2/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 27, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Adeyemi Fatoki by Timothy R. Tyler (Tyler, Timothy)
November 20, 2018 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (sxb, )
November 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
November 19, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 3225 (Judge Hollis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fatoki v. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Adeyemi Fatoki
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Represented By: James L. Hardemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Glenn B. Stearns
Represented By: Gerald Mylander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?