In re: Lion Air Flight JT 610 Crash
Plaintiff: Sutariyo, Bayu Saputra, Marsudi, Erwin Setiawan, Suhardi Bunarto, Yohanes Johni Sayersz, Merdian Agustin, Fahrida Kurniawati, LITERI Yana, Dhina Aldina Saputri, Desy Zulya, Tandina Sukarno Putri, Abdul Rahman, Septi Dursbianti, Hendrarti Hendraningrum, Budy Santosa, Mery Sundary, The Federal Aviation Administration, Liyanah, Marti Faidah, Putri, Sulaiman, Vini Wulandari, Dian Anindita Suryani, Rd Tris Tresnawati, Ellisa, Sri Subekti, R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini, Defirin, Ferry Pranata, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini, Fendy, Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah, Peri Zubandi, Yuke Meiske Pelealu, Satijo, Dony Suhardja Wijaya, Yulita as personal representative of the estate of Sari, Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni, Gibran Ali Rahardian, M Anzar Agustian, Herlina Husain, PUJI LESTARI, Ave Noerlina Purba, Tuti Chaerani, Dony Wijaya, Djap Fatimah, M Asdori, Welly Chandra, Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby, Dhini Retno Puspita, Ansori, Lim Des Su, Santi Amarti Sagala, Serly Oktaviani, Vincent Lionel, Yesenia Fernandez, Selviany Purba, Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai, Iryun Iryun, Erni, Rosanna Simarmata, Dian Andriani, Susmawati, Myrna Julia Sari, Mochamad Irzan, Lutfiyani Eka Putri, Muhammad Irfan, Mardiana HRP, Rohani Hasan, Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Wilson Sandi, Etmidalti, Juliana Wahab, Windy Marliandini Putri, M. Sholekhudin Zuhri, AM I Talib, GERIAN DWIKI SAKTI SAN PUTRA, Edwin Edwin, H. Irianto, Heru Susanto, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin, Septiana Damayanti, Dini Wahyu Wismaningsih, Elza Warti, Rima Wijayanti, Levina Natascha Subekti, Putri Pratiwi, Umar Nayiri, Dewi Marlina Manik, Intervenor, Nandang Suratman, Adhitya Wirawan, DANI ANDRIAN, Ari Priawanda, Novia, Siska Ong, Feny, Mala Rosita, FITRIYANTI, Taswad Bin Tashban, Ristuti, Rini Eka A Soegiyono, Laig Wie Ling, Rusman Ishak, Bina Asta Mastiti, Rismayanti, Dian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin, Anice Kasim, Ratna Sari Dewi, Multi Rizki, Andy Fhildyna, Evi Rahamwati, Turhindayani, Dela Farhana, Susan E Gitelson, Guy D. Iskandar Zen S., Laura Smith, Epi Samsul Komar, Murthado Kurniawan, Emmy Delima, Zakiah Apriani, Tri Indra Setiawan, Zakiah, Sri Hartati, Susanti Agustina, Yulita Sari, Ningsi, Moeljono Khan, Dony Suharja Wijaya, Dewi Afriza, Hesti Luh Suprobowati, Yadi Ismanto, Kabateck LLP, Brian S. Kabateck, Lie Miauw Sen, Iskandar, Mimin Suratmi, Ir Hasanuddin, Tayeb Tahir, Toni Priyono Adhi, Nursia Manurung, Endo Prabowo, Edy Susanto, James Sianturi, Gusmardi, Amri Syakban, Zainal Abidin, Sri Husman, A.R.N., Meylanda Crisdiana, RR Ine Yunita SI, Vetri, Petty Novita, Winda Juwita, Ulfah Kusumaningsih, Endang Sri Rejeki, Isti Khasanah, Norman Purnama, Puspawijayanti, Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi, Kiki Merdekawati, Septi Riyani, Sri Umi Anggraini, Siti Fatimah, SURYATI, Daniel Suharja Wijaya, Rabagus Noerwito Desi Putra and Terrence Buehler
Defendant: The Boeing Company, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, Collins Aerospace, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, Wencor Group LLC, Rockwell Collins, Inc., The Department of Transportation, Xtra Aerospace, LLC, The United States of America, United Technologies Corporation, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. and BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation
Petitioner: Ireneo Gapuz Aberin, Benjamin Gal-OR, David Fernandez Galor, Agnes Tjandra, Edelson PC, Monica C Fernandez and BartlettChen LLC
Respondent: Thomas Girardi, Erika Girardi, David Lira, Keith Griffin and Ribbeck Law Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv07686
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 1280 NOTICE by Daniel Thomas Burley of Change of Address (Burley, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1279 NOTICE by Bates McIntyre Larson of Change of Address (Larson, Bates)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 1274 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Siti Fatimah Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1273 MOTION by Plaintiff Siti Fatimah for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1272 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1271 MOTION by Plaintiff R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1270 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Umar Nayiri Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1269 MOTION by Plaintiff Umar Nayiri for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1268 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Fendy Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1267 MOTION by Plaintiff Fendy for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 11/18/2021. Edelson PC's motion to compel personal appearance of Keith Griffin #1194 is denied as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 1265 NOTICE by Ryan Donald Saba of Change of Address (Saba, Ryan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1264 PRETRIAL Memorandum (Saba, Ryan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1263 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing regarding the evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira is set for 11/18/2021 at 11:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 1262 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/15/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion to Appoint Guardian ad litem for Minor A.R.N. Order Number: 41877. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022. (Carrion, Elia)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1261 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Eleventh Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued, and the forum non conveniens briefing schedule is suspended. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 1/14/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 1260 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 1255 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1254 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1253 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1252 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1251 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: An evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira is set for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 a.m. and 12/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m. The courtroom location will be confirmed at a later time. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 1250 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Emmy Delima, Daniel Suharja Wijaya, Umar Nayiri, Siti Fatimah, Dony Suharja Wijaya, Rabagus Noerwito Desi Putra, Ansori, Fendy, Ari Priawanda, Terrence Buehler, AM I Talib, Susmawati against Collins Aerospace, Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America, Xtra Aerospace, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1249 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrence Buehler by Austin William Bartlett as Personal Representative and Supervised Administrator of the Estate of Permadi Anggrimulja (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1248 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrence Buehler by Austin William Bartlett Terrence Buehler as Personal Representative and Independent Administrator of the Estate of Liu Chandra (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' unopposed emergency motion for leave to file their second amended complaint #1246 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 1246 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ansori, Welly Chandra, Emmy Delima, Siti Fatimah, Fendy, Umar Nayiri, Ari Priawanda, Tandina Sukarno Putri, R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini, Susmawati, AM I Talib, Dony Suharja Wijaya, Daniel Suharja Wijaya, Rabagus Noerwito Desi Putra to amend/correct amended complaint,, #800 EMERGENCY MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNOPPOSED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 10/15/2021. Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini and Khan Family Claimants' motion to appoint Guardian ad litem for minor A.R.N. #1241 #1239 is denied. Boeing's motion to dismiss for forum non conveniens to be filed by 11/15/2021. Responses due by 12/15/2021. Reply is due by 1/5/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 1244 RESPONSE by A.R.N.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini to appoint Guardian ad litem for minor A.R.N. #1241 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini PLAINTIFF SRI UMI ANGGRAINI AND KHAN FAMILY CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR A.R.N. #1239 (Hunt, Keith)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1243 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini and Khan Family Claimants' motion to appoint guardian ad litem for Minor A.R.N. #1239 #1241 is set for 10/15/2021 at 11:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 1242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Sri Uni Anggraini's Motion to Seal Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem for Minor A.R.N. #1240 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 1241 MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini to appoint Guardian ad litem for minor A.R.N. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Indrajana, #2 Declaration of Sanjiv N. Singh)(Indrajana, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1240 MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini to seal MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR A.R.N. (Indrajana, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1239 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini PLAINTIFF SRI UMI ANGGRAINI AND KHAN FAMILY CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR A.R.N. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Indrajana, #2 Declaration of Sanjiv N. Singh)(Indrajana, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to substitute party #1237 is granted. Siti Fatimah is substituted in the place of Plaintiff Yohanes Johni Sayersz as the personal representative of the heirs of Rudolph Petrous Sayersz on behalf of herself and her three minor children, C.S.N., M.A.I., and I.J.N. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1237 MOTION by Plaintiff Siti Fatimah to substitute party Yohanes Johni Sayersz (Bartlett, Austin)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORDER on Plaintiff, Suryati, Special Administrator of the Estate of Rebiyanti's Motion to Approve Settlement: Motion for settlement #1232 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 1235 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Tenth Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 11/12/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 1234 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff SURYATI (Marks, Steven)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1233 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff SURYATI (Marks, Steven)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1232 MOTION by Plaintiff SURYATI for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1231 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The motion to seal #1229 is granted such that the Clerk is ordered to seal document #1227 . Furthermore, the Court orders the Clerk to seal document #1228 because of the personal information contained in paragraph 6. The Court understands that the parties to cases 19-cv-01552 and 20-cv-05773 are currently engaged in settlement negotiations. The Court will address these cases again when the negotiations conclude, whether successful or not. No party in these cases should file a status report again until that time. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 1229 MOTION by Plaintiff A.R.N. to seal document declaration #1227 Keith L. Hunt (Hunt, Keith)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1228 STATUS Report Supplemental Status Conference Statement Submitted on Behalf of Khan Family Claimants by Sri Umi Anggraini (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Indrajana, Michael)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1227 DECLARATION of Keith L Hunt (Hunt, Keith)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A.R.N.'s counsel, Keith Hunt, is ordered to file a declaration stating whether the email exchange described in Paragraph 4 of the "Status Report Statement Submitted on Behalf of Khan Family Claimants," #1208 took place with his knowledge and consent, and whether he approves of the Ribbeck Law Group instructing Kenneth Feinberg to wire A.R.N.'s funds "to Ribbeck Law's trust account." This declaration should be filed by 9/1/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 1225 NOTICE by Austin William Bartlett of Change of Address (Bartlett, Austin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1224 RESPONSE by Respondent Ribbeck Law Group to text entry,,, #1216 , status report #1208 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vuckovich, Adrian)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1223 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Ribbeck Law Group by Kathryne R. Hayes (Hayes, Kathryne)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1222 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Ribbeck Law Group by Adrian M. Vuckovich (Vuckovich, Adrian)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1221 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Edelson PC by Amy Hausmann (Hausmann, Amy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 8/26/2021. Due to Judge Durkin's trial schedule, the evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira set for 9/13/2021-9/14/2021 and the final pretrial conference set for 8/27/2021 are vacated. Judge Durkin's courtroom deputy will contact the parties at a later date to reschedule. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 1219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the notice of withdrawal #1217 , the motion to compel #1194 is terminated as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 1218 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing regarding the evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira is set for 8/26/2021 at 12:30 p.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 1217 Notice of and Request to Withdraw the Motion to Exclude Witness from Contempt Hearing Docket #1194 by Keith Griffin (Saba, Ryan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Khan Family Claimants filed a status report on 8/17/2021 #1208 in which they allege that the Ribbeck Law Group is "purporting to represent... ARN," despite ARN having retained Hunt & Associates to represent him in this matter. Specifically, among other allegations, the Khan Family claims that the Ribbeck Law Group has requested that funds for ARN "be wired to Ribbeck Law's trust account." The Ribbeck Law Group is ordered to file a response to these allegations by 8/27/2021. The Khan Family also made a number of allegations about scheduling in the ongoing mediation. The Ribbeck Law Group should not file a written response to those allegations because those issues should be addressed to the mediator. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 1215 PRETRIAL Memorandum (Saba, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1214 PRETRIAL Memorandum (Matthai, Edith)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1213 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amicus Curiae Edelson PC's Pretrial Memorandum Of Witnesses, Exhibits, And Legal Standard) by Alexander Glenn Tievsky on behalf of Edelson PC (Tievsky, Alexander)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1212 PRETRIAL Memorandum (Wade Scott, J.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1211 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Edelson PC (Amicus Curiae Edelson PC's Pretrial Memorandum Of Witnesses, Exhibits, and Legal Standard) (Wade Scott, J.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #1206 is granted. Attorney Ryan Saba for Keith Griffin added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 1209 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/29/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 41382. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.
August 17, 2021 Filing 1208 STATUS Report STATEMENT SUBMITTED ON BEHALF OF KHAN FAMILY CLAIMAINTS by Sri Umi Anggraini (Indrajana, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1207 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Keith Griffin by John Andrew O'Donnell (O'Donnell, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1206 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18572661. (Saba, Ryan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1205 RESPONSE by Respondent Keith Griffin to motion to compel #1194 Mr. Griffin to appear at hearing (Saba, Ryan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1204 REPLY by Keith Griffin to response to motion #1202 re to Preclude Miscellaneous witness (Saba, Ryan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1203 STIPULATION of Fact for Contempt Hearing (Saba, Ryan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1202 RESPONSE by Edelson PC to MOTION by Respondent Keith Griffin to compel miscellaneous witness #1191 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tievsky, Alexander)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1201 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/26/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status. Order Number: 41342. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/31/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1200 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Girardi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mitsos, Ryan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1199 CONFIDENTIALITY Order for Use Only in the Contempt Proceedings. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1198 STIPULATION regarding set/reset hearings,,, #1182 Re: Confidentiality Order for Use Only in the Contempt Proceeding (Matthai, Edith)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1197 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #1195 is granted. Attorney Bradley Edwin Faber terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Edelson PC's motion for leave to issue subpoena to Western Alliance Bank #1193 is granted. Mr. Griffin's response to Edelson PC's motion to compel personal appearance of Keith Griffin #1194 is due by 8/13/2021. No reply is to be filed unless the Court requests one. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 1195 MOTION by Attorney Bradley E. Faber to withdraw as attorney for A.R.N.. No party information provided (Faber, Bradley)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1194 MOTION by Movant Edelson PC to compel personal appearance of Keith Griffin (Tievsky, Alexander)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1193 MOTION by Movant Edelson PC for discovery from Western Alliance Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Western Alliance Bank)(Tievsky, Alexander)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Edelson firm is to file their response to the motion to compel #1191 by 8/10/2021. Mr. Griffin's reply is due by 8/13/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 1191 MOTION by Respondent Keith Griffin to compel miscellaneous witness (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Saba)(Saba, Ryan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1190 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' counsel reported via email that they have agreed to continue plaintiff's motion to substitute #1185 and stay briefing on it until after their mediation on 8/16/2021. Briefing on the motion is stayed, and the parties are to further discuss the motion after the mediation and advise the Court whether a briefing schedule is still necessary at that time. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 1189 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Ninth Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 9/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 1188 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Any responses to the motion to substitute party #1185 are due by 8/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone conference held on 7/26/2021 regarding the request by counsel for Mr. Griffin and Mr. Lira for documents from the Girardi Keese bankruptcy trustee. The Bankruptcy Trustee and their counsel were present on the call. A proposed protective order, as described on the record, is to be submitted for entry. Evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira set for 9/13/2021-9/14/2021 stands. Pretrial memos from the interested parties are due by 8/20/2021. A final pretrial conference is set for 8/27/2021 at 3:00 p.m., and will proceed by telephone. A representative from Boeing is not required to be present. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1186 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/08/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status. Order Number: 41164. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1185 MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Umi Anggraini to substitute party Plaintiff Moeljono Khan (Indrajana, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry 1183 did not have a PDF attached and is re-entered as follows. On the Court's own motion, the telephone conference set for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. is reset for 7/26/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Time change only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: On the Court's own motion, the telephone conference set for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. is reset for 7/26/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Time change only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 1182 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone conference is set for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. regarding the request by counsel for Mr. Griffin and Mr. Lira for documents from the Girardi Keese bankruptcy trustee. Counsel for Mr. Griffin and Mr. Lira are to arrange for the trustee and her counsel to be present on the call. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1181 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Edelson PC by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1180 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 7/8/2021 to discuss scheduling an evidentiary hearing on the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira. Potential witnesses and issues that may be raised were discussed. Medical records concerning Thomas Girardi's current mental state are to be delivered to chambers for in camera review by 7/29/2021. Counsel for David Lira, Keith Griffin, Thomas Girardi, the Edelson Law Firm, and the Wisner Law Firm are to jointly email Judge Durkin's courtroom deputy to confirm a hearing date of 9/13/2021-9/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 1178 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Edelson PC by Alexander Glenn Tievsky (Tievsky, Alexander)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1177 STATUS Report re Wiranofa/Soegiyono matters by Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1176 STATUS Report by Rini Eka A Soegiyono (Indrajana, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1175 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing on scheduling an evidentiary hearing regarding the contempt motion set for 7/8/2021 at 10:30 a.m. is reset for 11:30 a.m. Time change only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1174 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 7/8/2021 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss scheduling an evidentiary hearing regarding the contempt motion against Keith Griffin and David Lira. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER Approving Minors' Attorney Fees and Withdrawal from Blocked Accounts. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/2/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for attorney fees #1164 is granted. Enter order. The motion hearing scheduled for 7/8/2021 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for attorney fees #1164 is set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1170 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff A.R.N. by Bradley Edwin Faber (Faber, Bradley)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1169 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff A.R.N. by Delaney Adams Hunt (Hunt, Delaney)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1168 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff A.R.N. by Keith L. Hunt (Hunt, Keith)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER Approving Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements: Kiki Merdekawati terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/29/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 1166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone motion hearing held on 6/29/2021. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion for leave to file an attorney appearances on behalf of A.R.N. #1141 is granted, and the motion by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati to approve minor settlement #1122 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 1165 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Dewi Afriza, Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai, Rini Eka A Soegiyono Declaration of Charles Herrmann (Herrmann, Charles)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1164 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dewi Afriza, Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai, Rini Eka A Soegiyono for attorney fees (Herrmann, Charles)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1163 REPLY by Plaintiff A.R.N. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hunt, Keith)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER Amending That Portion of Previous Order Regarding Minor Blocked Account. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/28/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 1161 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to amend/correct #1160 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1160 MOTION by Plaintiff Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah to amend/correct order on motion for settlement,,,, add and terminate parties, #633 (Bartlett, Austin)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for leave to file attorney appearances on behalf of A.R.N. #1141 and the motion by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati to approve minor settlement #1122 is set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 6/25/2021 regarding the Moeljono Khan family and minor A.R.N. is reset for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 a.m. The dial-in information will remain the same. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 1157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Due to the Court closure for the Juneteenth holiday, the telephone status hearing set for 6/18/2021 regarding the Moeljono Khan family and minor A.R.N. is reset for 6/25/2021 at 10:00 a.m. The dial-in information will remain the same. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1156 OBJECTIONS by Moeljono Khan to MOTION by Plaintiff A.R.N. for leave to file Attorney Appearances on behalf of A.R.N., an Emancipated Minor #1141 , notice of motion #1142 (Indrajana, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/16/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/16/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1153 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims of the plaintiff RR Ine Yunita SI are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. RR Ine Yunita SI terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims of the plaintiff Endang Sri Rejeki are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Endang Sri Rejeki terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims of the plaintiff Serly Oktaviani are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Serly Oktaviani terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 1150 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Bartlett, Austin)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1149 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Bartlett, Austin)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1148 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Serly Oktaviani) (Indrajana, Michael)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1147 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati Exhibit 1 - Sealed Guardianship Order (Bartlett, Austin)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1146 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati to objections, #1125 in Filzaladi matter (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Bartlett, Austin)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing as to the motion for leave to file attorney appearances on behalf of A.R.N. set for 6/24/2021 is vacated. The motion will be addressed during the telephone call scheduled for 6/18/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 1144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 6/18/2021 at 8:30 a.m., regarding the Moeljono Khan family and minor A.R.N. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 13, 2021 Filing 1143 STATUS Report Submitted on Behalf of Khan Family Claimants by Moeljono Khan (Indrajana, Michael)
June 12, 2021 Filing 1142 NOTICE of Motion by Keith L. Hunt for presentment of motion for leave to file #1141 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/24/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Hunt, Keith)
June 12, 2021 Filing 1141 MOTION by Plaintiff A.R.N. for leave to file Attorney Appearances on behalf of A.R.N., an Emancipated Minor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hunt, Keith)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER Approving Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements: Motion for settlement #1138 is granted. Winda Juwita terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/11/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 1139 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Winda Juwita Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1138 MOTION by Plaintiff Winda Juwita for settlement JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT (Bartlett, Austin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Any response to the Objections to Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati' Motion to Approve Minor Settlement #1122 #1125 may be filed by 6/18/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 1126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint motions to approve minor settlements #1100 , #1102 , #1104 , #1106 , #1108 , #1110 , #1112 , #1114 , #1116 , #1118 are granted. Enter orders. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 1125 OBJECTIONS by Serly Oktaviani to MOTION by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati for settlement Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Minor Settlement #1122 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Indrajana, #2 Declaration of Rendy Kailimang)(Indrajana, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1124 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1123 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati SEALED GUARDIANSHIP ORDER OF MINOR (Bartlett, Austin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1122 MOTION by Plaintiff Kiki Merdekawati for settlement Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #1120 is amended as follows. The Clerk's Office is instructed to provide a certified copy and an Apostille copy of sealed document no. #567 (the "Sealed Exhibits") to Plaintiff Rini Eka A. Soegiyono's counsel, Sanjiv N. Singh and Michael B. Indrajana. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 4, 2021 EMAILED a copy of sealed document no. #567 to Plaintiff Rini Eka A. Soegiyono's counsel, Sanjiv N. Singh and Michael B. Indrajana. (sxb, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 1120 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to unseal document #1099 is denied. The Clerk's Office is instructed to provide a copy of sealed document no. #567 (the "Sealed Exhibits") to Plaintiff Rini Eka A. Soegiyono's counsel, Sanjiv N. Singh and Michael B. Indrajana. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 1119 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Isti Khasanah Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1118 MOTION by Plaintiff Isti Khasanah for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1117 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Petty Novita Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1116 MOTION by Plaintiff Petty Novita for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1115 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1114 MOTION by Plaintiff Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1113 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Norman Purnama Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1112 MOTION by Plaintiff Norman Purnama for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1111 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ferry Pranata Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1110 MOTION by Plaintiff Ferry Pranata for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1109 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Meylanda Crisdiana Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1108 MOTION by Plaintiff Meylanda Crisdiana for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1107 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Puspawijayanti Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1106 MOTION by Plaintiff Puspawijayanti for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1105 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Septi Riyani Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1104 MOTION by Plaintiff Septi Riyani for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1103 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Vetri Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1102 MOTION by Plaintiff Vetri for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1101 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ulfah Kusumaningsih Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1100 MOTION by Plaintiff Ulfah Kusumaningsih for settlement Joint Motion to Approve Minor Settlement (Bartlett, Austin)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1099 MOTION by Plaintiff Rini Eka A Soegiyono to unseal document sealed document #567 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry Simanjuntak)(Indrajana, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 1083 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Ir Hasanuddin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1082 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Iskandar (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1081 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Sri Husman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1080 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Gusmardi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1079 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Toni Priyono Adhi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1078 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Ellisa (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin) Modified on 5/14/2021 (ecw, ).
May 13, 2021 Filing 1077 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Nursia Manurung (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1076 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Lie Miauw Sen (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1075 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Ellisa (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1074 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff James Sianturi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1073 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Zainal Abidin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1072 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Tayeb Tahir (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1071 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Mimin Suratmi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1070 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Amri Syakban (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1069 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Edy Susanto (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1068 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Endo Prabowo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1067 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of the status report on the Wiranofa/Soegiyono matters #1066 . A joint written status report is due by 7/6/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 1066 STATUS Report re Wiranofa/Soegiyono matters by Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
May 9, 2021 Filing 1065 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/22/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion to Compel Arbitration. Order Number: 40690. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/31/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1064 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Eighth Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 7/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 1063 STATUS Report on remaining individual actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1062 STATUS Report Permadi-Khan matter by Tandina Sukarno Putri (Bartlett, Austin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1061 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court asked counsel to communicate with the Courtroom Deputy to schedule the next hearing. Recent emails with the Courtroom Deputy, however, have included legal argument about the facts of the case. Legal argument should only be communicated to the Court in filings on the docket. To the extent communications regarding scheduling implicate a legal issue or substantive facts about issues before the Court, that communication must be made in a status report on the docket. Future communications with the Courtroom Deputy should concern scheduling only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 1060 RESPONSE by Respondent David Lira to memorandum #1045 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Matthai, Edith)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1059 RESPONSE by Unknown Keith Griffin to memorandum #1045 (Saba, Ryan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1058 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute order #1057 is vacated. A corrected minute order is entered as follows. Telephone status hearing held on 4/26/2021 regarding the matter of Moeljono Khan (Decedent Permadi Anggrimulja), member case no. 20 C 5773. Counsel are to contact the courtroom deputy to schedule an in camera interview via video conference between minor A.R.N. and the Court, to take place within the next two weeks. The issue of whether to appoint a guardian ad litem is taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 1057 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone status hearing held on 4/26/2021 regarding the matter of Moeljono Khan (Decedent Permadi Anggrimulja), member case no. 20 C 5773. Counsel are to contact the courtroom deputy to schedule an in camera interview via video conference between minor A.R.N. and the Court, to take place within the next two weeks. The Court will then appoint a guardian ad litem. Counsel are encouraged to try to agree to a guardian ad litem. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 25, 2021 Filing 1056 STATUS Report Permadi-Khan matter by Tandina Sukarno Putri (Bartlett, Austin)
April 24, 2021 Filing 1055 STATUS Report on behalf of the Late Moeljono Khan and Minor Plaintiff A.R.N. by Moeljono Khan (Indrajana, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1054 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing is set for 4/26/2021 at 11:00 a.m. regarding the matter of Moeljono Khan (Decedent Permadi Anggrimulja), member case no. 20 C 5773. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 1053 NOTICE by Rafey S. Balabanian of Change of Address (Balabanian, Rafey)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 1050 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint motion for dismissal of plaintiff's claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlement #1046 and #1048 are granted. Plaintiffs Agnes Tjandra, Hesti Luh Suprobowat and Yadi Ismanto terminated. Enter orders. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 1049 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann re Minor Settlement (Herrmann, Charles)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1048 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement ,Dismissal, and approval of minor settlement. (Herrmann, Charles)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1047 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann re Minor Settlement (Herrmann, Charles)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1046 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement ,Dismissal, and approval of minor settlement. (Herrmann, Charles)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1045 MEMORANDUM by Anice Kasim Septiana Damayanti, Bian Daniaty binti Udin Zaenudin, and Bias Ramadhan A.S. bin Misyadi in Support of Motion to Show Cause Regarding Keith Griffin and David Lira (Wisner, Floyd)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1044 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Instanter #1040 is granted. Motion to file instanter #1038 is denied as moot. Respondents Lira and Griffin may file their responses to the Memorandum by 4/27/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1043 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Septiana Damayanti, Anice Kasim, Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin to file instanter #1038 (Matthai, Edith)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1042 RESPONSE by Keith Griffin to MOTION by Plaintiff Anice Kasim to file instanter AMENDED #1040 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Septiana Damayanti, Anice Kasim, Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin to file instanter #1038 (Saba, Ryan)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1041 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Respondent Lira may also file a response as to why he objects to the motion for leave to file memorandum instanter #1040 by 4/5/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 1040 MOTION by Plaintiff Anice Kasim to file instanter AMENDED (Wisner, Alexandra)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1039 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Respondent Griffin may file a response as to why he objects to the motion for leave to file memorandum instanter #1038 by 4/5/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 1038 MOTION by Plaintiffs Septiana Damayanti, Anice Kasim, Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin to file instanter (Wisner, Alexandra)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1037 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of the status report on the Wiranofa/Soegiyono matters #1036 . A joint written status report is due by 5/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 1036 STATUS Report re Wiranofa/Soegiyono by Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1035 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer #1034 is granted. All Defendants are to answer or otherwise plead in response to any pending complaints within 30 days from the date the Court lifts the stay on the proceedings in this consolidated action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 1034 MOTION by Defendants BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time to file answer Agreed (19-CV-01552, 19-cv-01701, 19-cv-05217, 19-cv-5220, 19-cv-07091, 20-cv-4137, 20-cv-5498, 20-cv-5773, 20-cv-6380) (Nichols, Shane)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1033 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Second unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #1032 is granted. The United States is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints within thirty (30) days after the stay of the litigation is lifted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 1032 MOTION by Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America for extension of time to file answer Unopposed extension of time to file answer in Case Nos: 19-cv-1552, 19-cv-5217, and 19-cv-5220 (Brady, Orla)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1031 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to amend/correct #712 is denied as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 1030 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone conference held on 3/22/2021. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion to compel #1013 is denied. A written status report is due by 3/26/2021. Parties are either to indicate that they agree to follow one of the courses outlined in the hearing, or to report any disagreement on what course to follow, and the Court will make the determination. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 1029 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appoint guardian/attorney ad litem #523 is denied as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 1028 STATUS Report by Brian S. Kabateck, Kabateck LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Noyes, Christopher)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1027 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the Order Approving Unopposed Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements in 19 C 797, all of plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati's claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Fahrida Kurniawati terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 1026 DECLARATION of Brian S. Kabateck regarding reply #1024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Herrmann, Charles)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1025 DECLARATION of Charles Herrmann regarding reply #1024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Herrmann, Charles)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1024 REPLY by Movant Agnes Tjandra to response in opposition to motion,, #1021 (Herrmann, Charles)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1023 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Seventh Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 5/7/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 1022 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1021 RESPONSE by Rini Eka A Soegiyonoin Opposition to MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra to compel FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION OF ATTORNEY FEES DISPUTE #1013 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sanjiv N. Singh in Support of Plaintiff Soegiyono's Counsel's Opposition to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Michael B. Indrajana in Support of Plaintiff Soegiyono's Counsel's Opposition to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration)(Indrajana, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1020 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The United States of America by Karleen Frances Murphy (Murphy, Karleen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1019 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Reply in support of the motion to compel #1013 is due by 3/12/2021. The telephone status hearing regarding the allocation of attorneys' fees for the Wiranofa and Soegiyono cases set for 3/8/2021 is reset for 3/22/2021 at 10:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 1018 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #1016 is granted. Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by 3/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 1017 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #1016 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/4/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1016 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond (Larson, Bates)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1015 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Response to the motion for order compelling arbitration of attorney fees dispute #1013 is due by 3/5/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 1014 DECLARATION of Charles Herrmann regarding motion to compel #1013 ARBITRATION OF ATTORNEY FEES DISPUTE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Herrmann, Charles)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1013 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra to compel FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION OF ATTORNEY FEES DISPUTE (Herrmann, Charles)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1012 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone status hearing regarding the allocation of attorneys' fees for the Wiranofa and Soegiyono cases is set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 1011 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Sixth Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions. The stay in litigation is continued to allow the parties to continue to engage in mediations and settlement negotiations. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 3/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 1010 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1009 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #1008 is granted. The United States is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by 3/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 1008 MOTION by Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America for extension of time to file answer in Case Nos: 19-cv-1552, 19-cv-5217, and 19-cv-5220 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brady, Orla)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER on Motion to Supplement Order Approving Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/22/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1006 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to supplement approval of minor settlements #1004 is granted. Enter Order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 1005 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra ISO Motion to Supplement (Herrmann, Charles)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1004 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra to supplement APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS - ECF 944 (Herrmann, Charles)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1003 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America by Robert Emmett Kelly (Kelly, Robert)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1002 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America by Jill Dahlmann Rosa in cases 19-cv-1552, 19-cv-5217, 19-cv-5220 (Rosa, Jill)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1001 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America by Orla M Brady in cases 19-cv-1552, 19-cv-5217, 19-cv-5220 (Brady, Orla)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1000 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motions for extension of time to answer #998 and #999 are granted. Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC is to to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by 3/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 999 MOTION by Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Wijaya) (Wheat, Nathan)
February 15, 2021 Filing 998 MOTION by Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Liyanah) (Wheat, Nathan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 997 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #995 is granted. Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints by 3/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 996 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #995 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
February 11, 2021 Filing 995 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Larson, Bates)
February 8, 2021 Filing 994 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/04/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 40086. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 993 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer #987 is granted. Defendants Rockwell Collins, Inc. and Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. are to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaints by 3/30/2021. Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #989 is granted. Defendants Wencor Group, LLC and Xtra Aerospace, LLC are to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Smith Amended Complaint by 3/30/2021. Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #990 is granted. Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC is to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Komar Amended Complaint by 3/30/2021. Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #991 is granted. Boeing is to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by 3/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 992 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #991 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
February 5, 2021 Filing 991 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Larson, Bates)
February 4, 2021 Filing 990 MOTION by Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Komar) (Wheat, Nathan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 989 MOTION by Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Smith) (Wheat, Nathan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 988 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The 2/19/2021 deadline for The Boeing Company to file a written status report is extended to 2/26/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 987 MOTION by Defendants Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. for extension of time to file answer AGREED (Nichols, Shane)
February 4, 2021 Filing 986 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held 2/4/2021. Motion to substitute attorney #918 is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 985 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini, Liyanah as to Xtra Aerospace, LLC on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 984 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar as to Xtra Aerospace, LLC on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 983 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini, Liyanah. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 982 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini, Liyanah. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 981 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 980 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Lubin, Peter)
February 3, 2021 Filing 979 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Nathan Michael Wheat (Wheat, Nathan)
February 3, 2021 Filing 978 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by John Michael Murray (Murray, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 977 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Christopher Scott Morin (Morin, Christopher)
February 2, 2021 Filing 976 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri Ex D to Sur-Reply (Bartlett, Austin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 975 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri Ex C to Sur-Reply (Bartlett, Austin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 974 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri Ex B to Sur-Reply (Bartlett, Austin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 973 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri to Sur-Reply - Ex A (Bartlett, Austin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 972 REPLY by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri to reply to response to motion, #968 Sur-Reply (Bartlett, Austin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 971 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri for leave to file 5-Page Sur-Reply to Address New Evidence #970 is granted. Plaintiff's counsel may file a 5-page sur-reply by 5 p.m. on 2/2/2021. No further filings will be allowed. Any additional arguments can be made orally. Oral argument is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:30 a.m., by telephone. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 970 MOTION by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri for leave to file 5-Page Sur-Reply to Address New Evidence (Bartlett, Austin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 969 DECLARATION of Sanjiv N. Singh regarding reply to response to motion, #968 DECLARATION OF SANJIV N. SINGH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MOELJONO KHAN'S REPLY TO TANDINA SUKARNO PUTRI'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR URGENT COURT INTERVENTION (Indrajana, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 968 REPLY by Moeljono Khan to memorandum in support of motion #947 filed concurrently in Case No. 20-cv-05773, ECF No. 20 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susanti Agustina, SH, MH, #2 Declaration of Michael B. Indrajana, #3 Declaration of Moeljono Khan, #4 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Indrajana, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 967 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Nathan Michael Wheat (Wheat, Nathan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 966 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Nathan Michael Wheat (Wheat, Nathan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 965 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by John Michael Murray (Murray, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 964 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by John Michael Murray (Murray, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 963 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Christopher Scott Morin (Morin, Christopher)
January 29, 2021 Filing 962 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Christopher Scott Morin (Morin, Christopher)
January 29, 2021 Filing 961 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion to withdraw #960 is granted. Attorney Jason G Shanfield terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 960 MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini to withdraw Appearance of Jason G. Shanfield (Lubin, Peter)
January 28, 2021 Filing 959 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri Supplemental Declaration of Austin Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
January 28, 2021 Filing 958 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Nathan Michael Wheat (Wheat, Nathan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 957 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by John Michael Murray (Murray, John)
January 28, 2021 Filing 956 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Christopher Scott Morin (Morin, Christopher)
January 25, 2021 Filing 955 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dony Suharja Wijaya regarding Summons and Complaint service on Department of Transportation served on Department of Transportation on January 6, 2021 via certified mail (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 954 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dony Suharja Wijaya regarding Summons and Complaint service on Federal Aviation Administration served on Federal Aviation Administration on January 6, 2021 via certified mail (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 953 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dony Suharja Wijaya regarding Summons and Complaint service on USA served on Attorney General of the United States on January 6, 2021 via certified mail (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 952 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dony Suharja Wijaya regarding Summons and Complaint service on USA served on U.S. Attorney Northern District of Illinois on January 6, 2021 (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 951 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dony Suharja Wijaya. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/15/2021. (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 950 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dony Suharja Wijaya. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/15/2021. (Bartlett, Austin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 949 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dony Suharja Wijaya. Xtra Aerospace, LLC waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Bartlett, Austin)
January 23, 2021 Filing 948 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri Declaration of Austin Bartlett with Sealed Exhibits (Bartlett, Austin)
January 23, 2021 Filing 947 MEMORANDUM by Tandina Sukarno Putri in support of motion to substitute attorney #918 and in opposition to Mr. Khan's Cross-Motion (Bartlett, Austin)
January 22, 2021 Filing 945 SUR-REPLY by Movant Edelson PC to statement #931 , text entry,, #936 , statement #932 (supplemental reply of Edelson PC regarding Keith Griffin and David Lira) (Edelson, Jay)
January 21, 2021 Filing 946 LETTER from Pacific Western Bank dated 1/14/2021. (mc, )
January 14, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC (member case 19-cv-05217) (txl, )
January 14, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Xtra Aerospace, LLC (member cases 19cv5220) (txl, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER Approving Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements #942 . Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/13/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 943 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Herrmann, Charles)
January 12, 2021 Filing 942 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement , and approval of minor settlement (Herrmann, Charles)
January 12, 2021 Filing 941 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Agreed motion for extension of time #940 is granted. Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by 2/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 940 MOTION by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. for extension of time AGREED (19-cv-07091) (Nichols, Shane)
January 12, 2021 Filing 939 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 938 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/08/21 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39908. Court Reporter Contact Information: EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
January 8, 2021 Filing 937 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #935 is vacated. The corrected order is entered as follows. Hearing held 1/8/2021. The freeze on the assets of Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese #879 is lifted, at the suggestion of the Trustees appointed in the Central District of California in cases 2:20-bk-21022-BR and 2:20-bk-21020-BR, in order to permit the orderly proceeding of those cases, and based on the representations of the Trustees that the assets of Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese will not be dissipated except on authority of the Trustees or the Bankruptcy Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 936 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Hearing held 1/8/2021. Motion for Rule to Show Cause as to Keith Griffin and David Lira #842 is continued. The Edelson Firm may file a further reply by 1/22/2021. The Court will consider the briefing already received and request additional briefing if necessary. To the extent the Court determines a hearing is necessary, it will take place in Chicago, in-person, and not until it is safe to travel and hold in-person hearings. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 935 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Hearing held 1/8/2021. The freeze on the assets of Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese #879 is lifted, on application of the Trustees appointed in the Central District of California in cases 2:20-bk-21022-BR and 2:20-bk-21020-BR, in order to permit the orderly proceeding of those cases, and based on the representations of the Trustees that the assets of Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese will not be dissipated except on authority of the Trustees or the Bankruptcy Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 934 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/30/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39895. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
January 8, 2021 Filing 933 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Mr. Bartlett is to file a brief in further support of the motion found at docket no. #918 and a response to Mr. Singh and Mr. Indrajana's motion found at docket no. 14 in case no. 20 C 5773 by 1/22/2021. Mr. Singh and Mr. Indrajana shall file their reply by 1/29/2021. No extensions will be granted. If possible, counsel should seek dual scheduling of the mediation, so that once this Court rules there will be no undue delay in the mediation taking place. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 932 Status Conference STATEMENT by David Lira (Sheean, Christopher)
January 7, 2021 Filing 931 Statement in advance of January 8, 2021 status conference STATEMENT by Keith Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saba, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 930 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (applies to 19-cv-02774) by The Boeing Company(Larson, Bates)
January 7, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America (member cases 19cv5220) (kl, )
January 7, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America (member case 19-cv-05217) (kl, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 929 REPLY by Edelson PC to Response, #903 , Response, #908 , sealed response, #905 in support of a finding of contempt as to David Lira and Keith Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Edelson, Jay)
January 4, 2021 Filing 928 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #926 is granted. Attorney Leigh Porter Robie for David Lira added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 4, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (exr, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 927 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/22/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39833. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
December 30, 2020 Filing 926 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17788777. (Robie, Leigh)
December 30, 2020 Filing 925 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to substitute attorney #918 is entered and continued. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 924 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Hearing held 12/30/2020 regarding cases 19cv3415, 19cv5311, 19cv2774, 19cv2764, and 19cv2919. Agreement reached among Plaintiffs' counsel to defer their disputes regarding allocation of attorneys' fees until Plaintiffs' settlements are funded and distributed. Plaintiffs' counsel are to memorialize the agreement reached on the record in an email sent to the courtroom deputy. Boeing's counsel will prepare agreements releasing any claims against Boeing regarding attorneys' fees. The parties are to report by email to the courtroom deputy when Boeing has distributed funds to Plaintiffs' counsel's escrow accounts and when the funds have been distributed to Plaintiffs from the escrow accounts. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 923 RESPONSE by Movant BartlettChen LLC to hearing in Filzaladi matter (Bartlett, Austin)
December 29, 2020 Filing 922 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone conference set for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. will also address the motions filed today in Moeljona v. The Boeing Company 20 C 5773. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 921 RESPONSE by Movant Agnes Tjandra TO PLAINTIFF RINI SEOGIYONO'S REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING - STATEMENT OF POSITION (Herrmann, Charles)
December 28, 2020 Filing 920 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court is in receipt of The Boeing Company's Fifth Status Report on Remaining Individual Actions #917 . The stay the litigation is continued through 2/28/2021 to allow the parties to continue to engage in mediations. The Boeing Company is to file a written status report by 2/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 919 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone conference is set for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m., regarding the claimants in Soegiyono v. Boeing Company 19 C 3415, Soegiyono v. Boeing Company 19 C 5311, Semendawai v. Boeing Company 19 C 2774, Oktaviani, et al. v. Boeing Company 19 C 2764, Sinarmata, et al. v. Boeing Company 19 C 2919. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 918 MOTION by Plaintiff Tandina Sukarno Putri to substitute attorney and guardian for A.R.N. (Bartlett, Austin)
December 23, 2020 Filing 917 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
December 23, 2020 Filing 916 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #914 is granted. Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by 3/8/2021. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 915 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #914 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
December 23, 2020 Filing 914 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Larson, Bates)
December 22, 2020 Filing 913 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/16/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39786. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
December 22, 2020 Filing 912 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 12/22/2020. The Edelson Law Firm and Wisner Law Firm are to file their replies to the responses to the order on rule to show cause by 1/5/2021. The Edelson Law Firm and Wisner Law Firm should be provided with the unredacted versions of any redacted documents filed that pertain to clients that they represent. Motion to enforce contempt order as to Erika Girardi #880 is withdrawn. Erika Girardi's counsel is to inform his client of the asset freeze that is in place, and convey to his client that she is to act in accordance with that order. Motion for order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 is granted for the reasons stated on the record. Motion for judgment #911 is denied without prejudice, for the reasons also stated on the record. A telephone status hearing is set for 1/8/2021 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss setting a civil contempt hearing. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 911 MOTION by Plaintiff Multi Rizki for judgment (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 910 SEALED EXHIBIT by Respondent David Lira Declaration of Kashoun regarding Response, #908 (Sheean, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 909 SEALED EXHIBIT by Respondent David Lira (Declaration of David Lira) regarding Response, #908 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-16)(Sheean, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 908 RESPONSE by Respondent David Lira to order on rule to show cause,,,, motion hearing,,, #848 (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Lira (Filed Under Seal), #2 Declaration Kashoun (Filed Under Seal), #3 Declaration Rekte, #4 Declaration Solomon, #5 Declaration Bigelow)(Sheean, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 907 SEALED EXHIBIT by Respondent David Lira regarding response in opposition to motion, #906 (Sheean, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 906 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini for order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Lira (Filed Under Seal), #2 Declaration Edith R. Mattai)(Sheean, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 905 SEALED RESPONSE by Keith Griffin to order on rule to show cause,,,, motion hearing,,, #848 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Griffin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Saba, Ryan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 904 RESPONSE by Keith Griffinin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini for order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saba, Ryan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 903 RESPONSE by Unknown Keith Griffin to order on rule to show cause,,,, motion hearing,,, #848 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Griffin, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted, #5 Exhibit D - Redacted, #6 Exhibit E - Redacted, #7 Exhibit F - Redacted, #8 Exhibit G - Redacted, #9 Exhibit H - Redacted)(Saba, Ryan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 902 REPLY by Plaintiffs Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini to notice of filing, #893 Reply in Support of Their Opposed Motion to Order Their Former Counsel to Produce Client File and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle (Lubin, Peter)
December 21, 2020 Filing 901 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Clerk's Office is instructed to provide plaintiffs' counsel from the Wisner Law Firm with the following docket entries filed under seal: #380 , #411 , #421 , and #426 . Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 900 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Erika Girardi by Matthew Charles Wasserman (Wasserman, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Filing 899 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Septiana Damayanti by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 898 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Septiana Damayanti by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 897 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Multi Rizki Exhibit A to Notice of Filing (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 896 NOTICE by Multi Rizki of Filing (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 895 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to substitute attorney #894 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 894 MOTION by Plaintiff Septiana Damayanti to substitute attorney (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 21, 2020 Filing 893 NOTICE by Thomas Girardi re MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini for order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Motion)(Monico, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 892 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #890 is granted. Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 2/26/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 891 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #890 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
December 21, 2020 Filing 890 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Larson, Bates)
December 21, 2020 Filing 889 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Hearing as to the Motion for Order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 is set for 12/22/2020 at 1:00 p.m., and will proceed by telephone. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 888 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent David Lira by Edith Rae Matthai (Matthai, Edith)
December 18, 2020 Filing 887 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #886 is granted. Attorney Edith Rae Matthai for David Lira added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 886 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17758751. (Matthai, Edith)
December 18, 2020 Filing 885 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Counsel for Movant Edelson PC is required to give notice of the 12/22/2020 hearing to Erika Girardi and her counsel by any reasonable means. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 884 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A hearing on the motion to enforce contempt order as to Erika Girardi #880 is set for 12/22/2020 at 1:00 p.m., and will proceed by telephone. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Movant Edelson PC, along with counsel for Erika Girardi, counsel for Thomas Girardi, counsel for the Girardi Keese Law Firm, counsel for David Lira, counsel for Keith Griffin, counsel for Boeing, and new counsel for the effected plaintiffs should all be present on the call. If Erika Girardi does not have counsel, she must be present on the call herself. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 883 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #881 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 882 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #881 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
December 18, 2020 Filing 881 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond (Larson, Bates)
December 18, 2020 Filing 880 MOTION by Movant Edelson PC to enforce contempt order as to Erika Girardi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Edelson, Jay)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/18/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 878 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent David Lira by Christopher T. Sheean (Sheean, Christopher)
December 17, 2020 Filing 877 PROPOSED ORDER by Thomas Girardi (Monico, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 876 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #873 is amended as follows. Thomas Girardi, the Girardi Keese Law Firm, David Lira, and Keith Griffin may file their responses to the Motion for Order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 by 12/21/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 875 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Clerk's Office is instructed to remove the transcript filed at docket entry #852 . A corrected transcript of the proceedings held on 12/14/2020 has been filed at docket entry #874 . Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 874 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/14/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39751. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
December 17, 2020 Filing 873 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Thomas Girardi and the Girardi Keese Law Firm are to file their responses to the Motion for Order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle #870 by 12/21/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 872 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 871 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Keith Griffin by Ryan Donald Saba (Saba, Ryan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 870 MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini for order to Former Counsel to Produce Client Files and Evidence of Express Authority to Settle (Lubin, Peter)
December 16, 2020 Filing 869 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone conference held on 12/16/2020. The government's motion to modify sealing order #850 is granted without objection. For the reasons stated on the record, this court will not be appointing a trustee. The asset freeze as to Thomas Girardi and the Girardi Keese Law Firm remains in place. The court reaffirms that a judgment was entered on 12/14/2020 against Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese in the amount of $2,000,000 plus interest as to Plaintiffs Anice Kasim, Septiana Damayanti, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin and Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 868 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
December 16, 2020 Filing 867 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Multi Rizki by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
December 16, 2020 Filing 866 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
December 16, 2020 Filing 865 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anice Kasim by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
December 16, 2020 Filing 864 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 863 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Multi Rizki by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 862 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 861 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anice Kasim by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 860 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to substitute attorney #856 , #857 , #858 and #859 are granted. Attorneys of Wisner Law Firm, P.C. and Husain Law + Associates, PC are granted leave to file their appearances for plaintiffs. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 859 MOTION by Plaintiff Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin to substitute attorney (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 858 MOTION by Plaintiff Multi Rizki to substitute attorney (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 857 MOTION by Plaintiff Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi to substitute attorney (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 856 MOTION by Plaintiff Anice Kasim to substitute attorney (Wisner, Alexandra)
December 16, 2020 Filing 855 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: To clarify minute entry #854 , ONLY counsel for Thomas Girardi, Girardi Keese, Edelson, and Boeing are required to be on the call. Counsel for plaintiffs who were not involved in the matters discussed in Monday's hearing are not required on the call this afternoon. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 854 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone conference is set for 12/16/2020 at 3:00 p.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Counsel for Thomas Girardi, Girardi Keese, Edelson, and Boeing are required on the call. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 853 RESPONSE by Respondent Thomas Girardi to order on rule to show cause,,,, motion hearing,,, #848 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Monico, Michael)
December 15, 2020 Filing 852 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/14/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39751. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 851 Proposed Order by Thomas Girardi (Monico, Michael)
December 14, 2020 Filing 850 MOTION by Plaintiff Intervenor to Modify Sealing Order (Kocoras, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 849 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #848 is amended as follows. The assets of Girardi Keese and Tom Girardi are now frozen until further order of the court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 848 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 12/14/2020 regarding motion for rule to show cause #842 . A civil contempt is entered against the law firm of Girardi Keese and against Tom Girardi individually, for the reasons stated on the record. Judgment is entered in the amount of $2,000,000.00, plus interest, as to Girardi Keese and Tom Girardi, for the reasons also stated on the record. By 12/15/2020, parties are to submit a proposed order as to the appointment of a trustee. A redacted copy of the under seal Girardi Keese filing #847 should be placed on the public record. Any future filings made under seal should also be provided to Boeing. Keith Griffin and David Lira are to file responses to the motion for rule to show cause #842 by 12/21/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 847 SEALED RESPONSE by Thomas Girardi to set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #843 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Monico, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Filing 846 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Thomas Girardi by Michael D. Monico (Monico, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Filing 845 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Attorneys Thomas Girardi, David Lira, and Keith Griffin, are ordered to appear by phone for the hearing as to the motion for rule to show cause on 12/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. #843 , by dialing 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 844 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement in 20 C 6097 is granted. Juliana Wahab terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 843 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Girardi Keese is to file a written response to show cause why it should not be held in contempt for violating the Court's orders by 12/10/2020. A telephone hearing as to the motion for rule to show cause #842 is set for 12/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 842 MOTION by Movant Edelson PC for rule to show cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Scharg, #2 Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian)(Balabanian, Rafey)
December 2, 2020 Filing 841 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time #838 is granted. Defendants Wencor Group, LLC and Xtra Aerospace, LLC are to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Smith Amended Complaint by 2/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 840 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Marnie Allison Holz (Holz, Marnie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 839 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Telly Andrews (Andrews, Telly)
December 1, 2020 Filing 838 MOTION by Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC for extension of time UNOPPOSED (re Indiv. Case No. 19-cv-07091) (Walker, Richard)
December 1, 2020 Filing 837 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wencor Group LLC, Xtra Aerospace, LLC by Richard Alan Walker (Walker, Richard)
November 24, 2020 Filing 836 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Smith as to Xtra Aerospace, LLC on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Marchino, Filippo)
November 24, 2020 Filing 835 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Smith as to Wencor Group LLC on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Marchino, Filippo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 834 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Laura Smith regarding Summons, First Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery served on Xtra Aerospace LLC on 11/18/20 (Marchino, Filippo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 833 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Laura Smith regarding Summons, First Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery, Finding of Relatedness Pursuant To Local Rule 40.4 served on Wencor Group LLC on 11/19/20 (Marchino, Filippo)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER on Plaintiff, Gerian Dwiki Sakti Sanusi Putra's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/18/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER on Plaintiff's, Zakiah Apriani and Mochamad Irzan, Co-Special Administrators of the Estate of Chairul Aswan's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/18/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 830 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff GERIAN DWIKI SAKTI SAN PUTRA (Marks, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Filing 829 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff GERIAN DWIKI SAKTI SAN PUTRA (Marks, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Filing 828 MOTION by Plaintiff GERIAN DWIKI SAKTI SANUSI PUTRA for settlement approval (Marks, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 827 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Zakiah Apriani, Mochamad Irzan (Marks, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 826 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mochamad Irzan and Zakiah Apriani (Marks, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 825 MOTION by Plaintiffs Zakiah Apriani, Mochamad Irzan for settlement approval (Marks, Steven)
November 17, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Wencor Group LLC and Xtra Aerospace, LLC. (lxk, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER on Plaintiff, Guy Daud Iskandar Zen S., Special Administrator of the Estate of Fiona Ayu Zen S.'s Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/16/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 823 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Guy D. Iskandar Zen S. (Marks, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Filing 822 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Guy D. Iskandar Zen S. (Marks, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Filing 821 MOTION by Plaintiff Guy D. Iskandar Zen S. for settlement approval (Marks, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Filing 820 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laura Smith. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Marchino, Filippo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 819 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (20-cv-05498) by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
November 5, 2020 Filing 818 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The joint unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #814 has been is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/10/2020 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 817 Joint Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
November 5, 2020 Filing 816 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #814 is granted. Boeing is to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by 2/8/2021. Rosemount is to answer the Smith Amended Complaint (Case No. 19-cv-07091) by 2/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 815 Joint Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #814 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
November 5, 2020 Filing 814 MOTION by Defendants BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Joint Unopposed (19-cv-00797) (19-cv-01552) 19-cv-05217) (19-cv-05220) (19-cv-07091) (Larson, Bates)
November 5, 2020 Filing 813 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Erni's claims in 19 C 2919 and 18 C 8676 shall be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 812 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marks, Steven)
November 4, 2020 Filing 811 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/27/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39469. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER on Plaintiff, Erni, Special Administrator of the Estate of Fendi Christanto's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/4/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ecw, ).
November 4, 2020 Filing 809 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for settlement #806 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 808 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Erni (Marks, Steven)
November 4, 2020 Filing 807 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Erni (Marks, Steven)
November 4, 2020 Filing 806 MOTION by Plaintiff Erni for settlement (Marks, Steven)
November 3, 2020 Filing 805 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #804 granted Defendant's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #802 . This Court will also recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 6239 pending before Judge Kness and 20 C 6380 pending before Judge Lefkow be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 804 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #802 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 6241 pending before Judge Pacold be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 803 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #802 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/4/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 28, 2020 Filing 802 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Larson, Bates)
October 27, 2020 Filing 801 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ansori, Welly Chandra, Emmy Delima, Fendy, Umar Nayiri, Ari Priawanda, Tandina Sukarno Putri, Yohanes Johni Sayersz, R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini, Susmawati, AM I Talib by Austin William Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum to Appearance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 800 First AMENDED complaint by Dony Suhardja Wijaya, Welly Chandra, Putri, AM I Talib, Ansori, Yohanes Johni Sayersz, Fendy, R Ayu Ghea Sofa Anggraini, Susmawati, Tandina Sukarno Putri, Umar Nayiri, Ari Priawanda, Emmy Delima against Collins Aerospace, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America, Xtra Aerospace, LLC, Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 799 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation of dismissal has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims of Plaintiff Dony Suhardja Wijaya, individually and as co-Special Administrator, with respect to Decedent Restia Amelia and the estate of Restia Amelia shall be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. All claims of Plaintiff Rusman Ishak, including, but not limited to, his claims individually and as co-Special Administrator with respect to Decedent Daniel Suhardja Wijaya and the estate of Daniel Suhardja Wijaya, shall be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 798 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 10/27/2020 regarding motion to enforce settlement #779 . Motion to enforce #779 is withdrawn. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 797 STIPULATION of Dismissal (relating to Case No. 19-cv-01701) (Larson, Bates)
October 26, 2020 Filing 796 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Laura Smith against BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, Collins Aerospace, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, Xtra Aerospace, LLC, Wencor Group LLC (Marchino, Filippo)
October 26, 2020 Filing 795 First AMENDED complaint by Epi Samsul Komar, DANI ANDRIAN against Collins Aerospace, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, The United States of America, Xtra Aerospace, LLC (Lubin, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 794 First AMENDED complaint by Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini, Liyanah against Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company, The United States of America, The Department of Transportation, The Federal Aviation Administration, Collins Aerospace, Xtra Aerospace, LLC (Lubin, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 793 First AMENDED complaint by Fahrida Kurniawati against BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation (Buehler, Terrence)
October 26, 2020 Filing 792 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #791 is amended to include that the emergency motion for leave to file a first amended complaint filed in related case 20 C 5773 was granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 791 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 10/26/2020 regarding emergency motions to file amended complaints. Defendants represent that they have no position on the motions. Motions to file amended complaints #777 , #781 , #782 , #784 , 787 and #788 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 790 NOTICE of Motion by Austin William Bartlett for presentment of before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/27/2020 at 11:00 AM. (Bartlett, Austin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 789 RESPONSE by Dony Suhardja Wijayain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Rusman Ishak to enforce Settlement and for other relief. #779 and CROSS-MOTION for production of agreements (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 24, 2020 Filing 788 MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Smith to amend/correct Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed FAC, #2 Exhibit Redline of proposed FAC)(Marchino, Filippo)
October 23, 2020 Filing 786 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Hearing for presentment of Plaintiff Rusman Ishak's motion to enforce settlement #779 set for 10/29/2020 is reset to 10/27/2020 at 11:00 a.m. and will be conducted by telephone. To join the call, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 785 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Scott Lubin for presentment of motion to amend/correct #784 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lubin, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Filing 784 MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, Epi Samsul Komar to amend/correct Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Lubin, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Filing 783 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Scott Lubin for presentment of motion to amend/correct #782 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lubin, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Filing 782 MOTION by Plaintiffs Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini to amend/correct Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Lubin, Peter)
October 23, 2020 Filing 781 MOTION by Plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati to amend/correct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Buehler, Terrence)
October 23, 2020 Filing 780 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion to enforce #779 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/29/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
October 23, 2020 Filing 779 MOTION by Plaintiff Rusman Ishak to enforce Settlement and for other relief. (Marks, Steven)
October 23, 2020 Filing 778 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone hearing on emergency motion for leave to file first amended complaint #777 is set for 10/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Any additional emergency motions for leave to file an amended complaint should be noticed for the same time. To join the telephone call, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 777 MOTION by Plaintiff Dony Suhardja Wijaya to amend/correct COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Bartlett, Austin)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER Amending That Portion of Previous Orders Regarding Minors Blocked Accounts. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/23/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 775 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' motion for order amending that portion of previous orders regarding minors blocked accounts #772 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 774 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #770 is granted. Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by January 8, 2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 773 NOTICE of Motion by Austin William Bartlett for presentment of motion to amend/correct #772 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Bartlett, Austin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 772 MOTION by Plaintiff Bina Asta Mastiti to amend/correct Order Regarding Minors Blocked Accounts (Bartlett, Austin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 771 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #770 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 22, 2020 Filing 770 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Larson, Bates)
October 20, 2020 Filing 768 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #766 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 5, 2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 767 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #766 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 20, 2020 Filing 766 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Larson, Bates)
October 19, 2020 Filing 769 SECOND AMENDED complaint by plaintiffs against All Defendants (rp, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 765 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file second amended complaint #763 is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 764 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of motion for leave to file #763 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrmann, Charles)
October 16, 2020 Filing 763 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for leave to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Herrmann, Charles)
October 15, 2020 Filing 762 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #759 is granted. Defendant Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 12/26/2020. Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #760 is granted. Defendant Boeing is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 12/21/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 761 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #759 , motion for extension of time to file answer #760 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 15, 2020 Filing 760 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Larson, Bates)
October 15, 2020 Filing 759 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Larson, Bates)
October 15, 2020 Filing 758 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant The Boeing Company's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #756 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 6097 pending before Judge Pacold be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 757 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #756 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 14, 2020 Filing 756 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
October 13, 2020 Filing 755 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is due by 12/23/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 754 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant The Boeing Company's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #751 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 5773 pending before Judge Seeger be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 753 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
October 13, 2020 Filing 752 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #751 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
October 13, 2020 Filing 751 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
October 9, 2020 Filing 750 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation, all the claims of plaintiffs Johan Harry Saroinsong and Zila Venita, successors-in-interest and surviving heirs of Hizkia Jorry Saroinsong, deceased, are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to effectuate settlement, including enforcement, adjudication of liens, approval where necessary, and any other pendant matters. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 749 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of claims of Plaintiffs JOHAN HARRY SAROINSONG and ZILA VENITA (joint) (Larson, Bates)
October 5, 2020 Filing 748 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file #746 and #747 are granted. Attorneys Peter Scott Lubin, Patrick Doyle Austermuehle, Jason G Shanfield, and Monica R. Kelly for Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar, Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini added. Attorneys Benjamin Harris Richman, Ari Jonathan Scharg, Rafey S. Balabanian and Jay Edelson terminated. Motion for leave to file #745 is terminated as moot. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 747 MOTION by Plaintiffs Liyanah, Gibran Ali Rahardian, Anindita Rahmiana Sekarini for leave to file Substitute Appearances Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Lubin, Peter)
October 5, 2020 Filing 746 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar for leave to file Substitute Appearances Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Lubin, Peter)
October 2, 2020 Filing 745 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dian Andriani, Epi Samsul Komar for leave to file Substitute Appearances Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Lubin, Peter)
October 1, 2020 Filing 744 STATUS Report JOINT (19-cv-00797) by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER on Plaintiff, Rusman Ishak's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/23/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER on Plaintiff, Fitriyanti, Special Administrator of the Estate of Nikki Bagus Santoso's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/23/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 741 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Rusman Ishak (Marks, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 740 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Rusman Ishak (Marks, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 739 MOTION by Plaintiff Rusman Ishak for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 738 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant The Boeing Company's motion to reassign cases based on relatedness #736 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 4795 pending before Judge Rowland, case 20 C 4796 pending before Judge Kendall, and case 20 C 5498 pending before Judge Pacold be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 737 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #736 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/24/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
September 18, 2020 Filing 736 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Larson, Bates)
September 17, 2020 Filing 735 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Fitriyanti (Marks, Steven)
September 17, 2020 Filing 734 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Fitriyanti (Marks, Steven)
September 17, 2020 Filing 733 MOTION by Plaintiff FITRIYANTI for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
September 16, 2020 Filing 732 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for extension of time to answer #730 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 10/21/2020. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 731 Agreed (20-cv-04137) NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #730 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/22/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
September 16, 2020 Filing 730 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Agreed (20-cv-04137) (Larson, Bates)
September 12, 2020 Filing 729 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/31/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Order Number: 39168. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, (312) 408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2020. (Carrion, Elia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 728 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal, Yuke Meiske Pelealu (as Co-Special Administrator of the Estate of Rudolf Petrus Sayers) is dismissed with prejudice. Yuke Meiske Pelealu terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 727 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marks, Steven)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/2/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/2/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 724 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sulaiman #324 #722 Declaration in Support of Joint Motion for Dismissal and Approval of Minor Settlement (Routh, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 723 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Satijo #324 #721 Declaration in Support of Joint Motion for Dismissal and Approval of Minor Settlement (Routh, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 722 MOTION by Plaintiff Sulaiman for order Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement (Routh, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 721 MOTION by Plaintiff Satijo for order Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement, MOTION by Plaintiff Satijo for judgment on the pleadings (Routh, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 720 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 8/31/2020 regarding motion to withdraw as attorney #717 . Motion to withdraw as attorney #717 is granted. Joint status report is due 10/01/2020 in regards to settlement discussions between plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati and Defendant. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 719 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone motion #717 hearing is set for 8/31/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Please call (877) 402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 718 NOTICE of Motion by James Jacob Lessmeister for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #717 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lessmeister, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 717 MOTION by Attorney James J. Lessmeister and Jimmy A. Samad to withdraw as attorney for Fahrida Kurniawati. New address information: Fahrida Kurniawati, Green Park 2, Blok F, No 19 RT002 RW 016 Sperong Sub Dist, Tangerange City, Baten Province, Indonesia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lessmeister, James)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER Modifying Orders Approving Minor Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/17/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 714 STATUS Report JOINT (19-cv-02774; 19-cv-03415; 19-cv-05311) by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
August 17, 2020 Filing 713 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Hedayat, Mazyar)
August 17, 2020 Filing 712 MOTION by Plaintiff Siska Ong to amend/correct order,,, add and terminate parties,, #600 , order,,, add and terminate parties,, #599 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hedayat, Mazyar)
August 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER AMENDING THAT PORTION OF PREVIOUS ORDERS REGARDING MINORS BLOCKED ACCOUNTS Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/16/2020:Mailed notice(dl, )
August 16, 2020 Filing 710 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion by Movant Agnes Tjandra for order amending that portion of previous orders regarding minors blocked accounts #707 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (dl)
August 16, 2020 Filing 709 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint Status Report is due by 10/13/2020. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 708 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Lindquist for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #707 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lindquist, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 707 MOTION by Movant Agnes TjandraORDER AMENDING THAT PORTION OF PREVIOUS ORDERS REGARDING MINORS BLOCKED ACCOUNTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lindquist, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 706 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Parties are directed to file joint status report by 10/13/2020. Mailed notice (dl)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/13/2020. Mailed notice (smm, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 705 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
August 5, 2020 Filing 704 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, Rohani Hasan, as Personal Representative ofthe Estate of Reni Ariyanti, deceased, is dismissed with prejudice. Rohani Hasan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Reni Ariyanti, deceased,terminated. Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 703 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, Yulita Sari, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sian Sian, deceased, is dismissed with prejudice. Yulita Sari, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sian Sian, deceased, terminated.Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 702 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, Murthado Kurniawan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Resky Amalia,is dismissed with prejudice. Murthado Kurniawan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Resky Amalia terminated.Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 701 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, Yulita Sari, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wanto, deceased, is dismissed with prejudice. Yulita Sari, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wanto, deceased, terminated.Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 700 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, Suhardi Bunarto is dismissed with prejudice. Suhardi Bunarto terminated.Mailed notice (sxw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 699 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Rohani Hasan, as personal representative of the estate of Reni Ariyanti, deceased (Larson, Bates)
August 5, 2020 Filing 698 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sari as Personal Rep. of Estate of Sian Sian (Routh, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 697 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kurniawan as Person Rep. Estate of Resky Amalia (Routh, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 696 STIPULATION of Dismissal Yulita Sari as Personal Rep. of Estate of Wanto (Routh, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 695 STIPULATION of Dismissal Suhardi Bunarto Estate of Henny Heuw (Routh, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 694 AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, M. ASDORI, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MUHAMMAD SYAFI'I'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/4/2020.Mailed notice(sxw, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 693 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant's motion for reassignment of related cases #692 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that the following cases be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. 20 C 4000, pending before Judge Guzman and 20 C 4137 pending before Judge Kennelly. Mailed notice (sxw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 692 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Larson, Bates)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, M. ASDORI, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MUHAMMAD SYAFI'I'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. Plaintiff's motion for approval of settlement #686 is granted. M Asdori terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/28/2020.Mailed notice(sxw, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 690 AMENDED ORDER on Plaintiff, Putru Pratiwi, Special Administrator of the Estate of Wahyu Allidila and Xherdan Fachridzi's motion to approve settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/28/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 689 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff M Asdori (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 688 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff M Asdori (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER on Plaintiff, PUTRIPRATIWI, Special Administrator of the Estate of WAHYU ALLDILA and XHERDAN FACHRIDZI's motion to approve settlement. Plaintiff's motion to approve settlement #683 is granted. Putri Pratiwi terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/27/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 686 MOTION by Plaintiff M Asdori for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 685 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Putri Pratiwi (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 684 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Putri Pratiwi (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 683 MOTION by Plaintiff Putri Pratiwi for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 682 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/17/2020 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. (relates to 19 CV 3415 and 19 CV 5311). Order Number: 38646. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (Spee, Amy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 681 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to withdraw as attorney #680 is granted; Attorney Steven Alan Hart and John Shannon Marrese terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 680 MOTION by Attorney Steven A. Hart and John S. Marrese to withdraw as attorney for Serly Oktaviani, Rini Eka A Soegiyono. No party information provided (Hart, Steven)
July 23, 2020 Filing 679 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to 9/4/2020 to answer or otherwise plead as to case 20 C 3241 #678 is granted.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 678 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer AGREED (20-CV-03241) (Larson, Bates)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, SRI HARTATI, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ERYANT'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #674 is granted. Sri Hartati terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/16/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 676 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sri Hartati (Marks, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 675 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sri Hartati (Marks, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 674 MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Hartati for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 673 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to stipulation, Susan Gitelson is dismissed with prejudice. Susan E Gitelson (Special Administrator of the Estate of Sudibyo Onggowardoyo, Deceased) terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, DONY WIJAYA, AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF INAYAH FATWA KURNIA DEWI'S MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT TO CHANGE BANK. Plaintiff's motion for an order #670 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/15/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 671 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dony Wijaya (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 670 MOTION by Plaintiff Dony Wijaya for order to Modify 4/08/20 Order #488 to Change Bank (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 669 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to stipulation of dismissal, LITERI YANA, as Special Administrator of the Estate of DONY,is hereby dismissed with prejudice.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, TASWAD BIN TASHBAN, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF KHOTIJAH'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. Taswad Bin Tashban terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 667 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion for settlement #662 is granted. Counsel is to submit a dismissal order for signature.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, PERI ZUBANDI, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF DIAH DAMAYANTI'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #656 is granted. Peri Zubandi terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 665 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #662 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 664 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Taswad Bin Tashban (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 663 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Taswad Bin Tashban (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 662 MOTION by Plaintiff Taswad Bin Tashban for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 661 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plaintiff, Literi Yana (Marks, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 660 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #656 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 659 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Peri Zubandi (Marks, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 658 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Peri Zubandi (Marks, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 657 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Peri Zubandi (Marks, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 656 MOTION by Plaintiff Peri Zubandi for settlement (Marks, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF, LITERI YANA, SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF DONY'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT. Motion for settlement #649 is granted. LITERI Yana terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 654 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff LITERI Yana (Marks, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk4, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 652 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff LITERI Yana (Marks, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Filing 651 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff LITERI Yana (Marks, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Filing 650 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #649 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/15/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Filing 649 MOTION by Plaintiff LITERI Yana for settlement approval (Marks, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 647 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:A joint status report is to be filed by 8/7/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 646 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER MODIFYING ORDERS APPROVING MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiffs' motion to modify settlement is granted. #644 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 644 MOTION by Plaintiffs DANI ANDRIAN, M Anzar Agustian, Merdian Agustin, Susanti Agustina, Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby, Dian Andriani, Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni, Suhardi Bunarto, Suhardi Bunarto, Tuti Chaerani, Welly Chandra, Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah, Septiana Damayanti, Defirin, Ratna Sari Dewi, Septi Dursbianti, Edwin Edwin, Ellisa, Etmidalti, Marti Faidah, Dela Farhana, Djap Fatimah, Feny, Yesenia Fernandez, Yesenia Fernandez, Andy Fhildyna, Susan E Gitelson, Mardiana HRP, Rohani Hasan, Hendrarti Hendraningrum, Herlina Husain, Muhammad Irfan, H. Irianto, Iryun Iryun, Rusman Ishak, Anice Kasim, Epi Samsul Komar, Murthado Kurniawan, Murthado Kurniawan, Fahrida Kurniawati, PUJI LESTARI, Lim Des Su, Laig Wie Ling, Vincent Lionel, Dewi Marlina Manik, Marsudi, Bina Asta Mastiti, Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Ningsi, Novia, Serly Oktaviani, Yuke Meiske Pelealu, Ferry Pranata, Ave Noerlina Purba, Selviany Purba, Dhini Retno Puspita, Lutfiyani Eka Putri, Windy Marliandini Putri, Evi Rahamwati, Abdul Rahman, Rismayanti, Ristuti, Rosanna Simarmata, Mala Rosita, Santi Amarti Sagala, Wilson Sandi, Budy Santosa, Bayu Saputra, Dhina Aldina Saputri, Myrna Julia Sari, Yulita Sari, Yulita Sari, Yulita Sari, Yulita as personal representative of the estate of Sari, Yulita as personal representative of the estate of Sari, Satijo, Satijo, Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai, Erwin Setiawan, Tri Indra Setiawan, Rini Eka A Soegiyono, Levina Natascha Subekti, Sri Subekti, Sulaiman, Sulaiman, Mery Sundary, Nandang Suratman, Dian Anindita Suryani, Heru Susanto, Sutariyo, Rd Tris Tresnawati, Turhindayani, Elza Warti, Dony Wijaya, Dony Suhardja Wijaya, Rima Wijayanti, Adhitya Wirawan, Dini Wahyu Wismaningsih, Vini Wulandari, Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin, Zakiah, M. Sholekhudin Zuhri, Desy Zulya for settlement of Minors to Change Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Modifying Orders Approving Minor Settlements, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noyes, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER on Plaintiff, Erwin Setiawan, Special Administrator of the Estate of Muchtar Rasyid's motion to approve settlement. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/30/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 643 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff, Erwin Seitiawan, as special administrator of the estate of Muchtar Rasyid's motion for settlement #638 is granted. No appearance is required on 7/2/2020. Erwin Setiawan terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 642 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, Plaintiff Mala Rosita's claims are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Mala Rosita terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 641 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #638 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/2/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 640 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Erwin Setiawan (Marks, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 639 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Erwin Setiawan (Marks, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 638 MOTION by Plaintiff Erwin Setiawan for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 637 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Mala Rosita (Marks, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #619 is granted; Tri Indra Setiawan terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #623 is granted; Herlina Husain terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiffs' motion for settlement #621 is granted. Ratna Sari Dewi and Rismayanti terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #617 is granted; Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiffs motion for settlement #615 is granted; M Anzar Agustian terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #613 is granted. Dian Anindita Suryani terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #611 is granted. Sri Subekti terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #609 is granted. Septi Dursbianti terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #607 is granted. Lutfiyani Eka Putri terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #605 is granted. Windy Marliandini Putri terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #603 is granted. Bina Asta Mastiti terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/25/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 624 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Herlina Husain Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 623 MOTION by Plaintiff Herlina Husain for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 622 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ratna Sari Dewi, Rismayanti Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 621 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ratna Sari Dewi, Rismayanti for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 620 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tri Indra Setiawan Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 619 MOTION by Plaintiff Tri Indra Setiawan for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 618 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 617 MOTION by Plaintiff Ulfa Wiwit Chasanah for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 616 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff M Anzar Agustian Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 615 MOTION by Plaintiff M Anzar Agustian for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 614 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dian Anindita Suryani Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 613 MOTION by Plaintiff Dian Anindita Suryani for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 612 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sri Subekti Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 611 MOTION by Plaintiff Sri Subekti for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 610 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Septi Dursbianti Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 609 MOTION by Plaintiff Septi Dursbianti for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 608 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lutfiyani Eka Putri Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 607 MOTION by Plaintiff Lutfiyani Eka Putri for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 606 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Windy Marliandini Putri Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 605 MOTION by Plaintiff Windy Marliandini Putri for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 604 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bina Asta Mastiti Declaration of Counsel (Bartlett, Austin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 603 MOTION by Plaintiff Bina Asta Mastiti for settlement approval (Bartlett, Austin)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER MODIFYING ORDERS APPROVING MINOR SETTLEMENTS: Plaintiffs' uncontested motion to modify orders #601 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/24/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 601 MOTION by Plaintiffs Merdian Agustin, Yesenia Fernandez, Wilson Sandi, Dhina Aldina Saputri, Myrna Julia Sari, Adhitya Wirawan, M. Sholekhudin Zuhri for order Modifying Orders Approving Minors Settlements to Change Banks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noyes, Christopher)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT. All claims of plaintiffs: SISKA ONG, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ROBERT SUSANTO, individually, and as next friend of her minor child H.N., in Consolidated Case No. 1: 18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-02720; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR. All claims of plaintiffs: SISKA ONG, as Personal Representative of the Estate of WENDY, individually, and as next friend of her minor child H.N., in Consolidated Case No. 1: 18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-02720; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs; Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 598 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to reassign cases as related #595 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that cases, 20 C 2720, 20 C 3241, 20 C 3243, 20 C 3245, 20 C 3246, 20 C 3247, and 20 C 3248 be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 597 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Telephonic status hearing held on 6/17/2020. The parties are to file a joint status report by 8/17/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 596 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing on motion to appoint guardian ad litem #523 is set for 6/17/2020 at 02:00 PM. Counsel is directed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 595 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case as Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Larson, Bates)
June 9, 2020 Filing 594 REPLY by Rini Eka A Soegiyono to response in opposition to motion, #566 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of BSK ISO Reply, #2 Declaration of SS ISO Reply, #3 Declaration M.I. ISO Reply)(Noyes, Christopher)
June 4, 2020 Filing 593 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #581 plaintiffs Elza Warti, Multi Rizki, WesthiRamandina, Mungni Rifki, Muhammad Nur Fuadi, and M. Nuran Tk. Mudo, successors-in interest and surviving heirs of Rijal Mahdi,are dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement. The Court retains jurisdiction to effectuate settlement, including enforcement, adjudication of liens, approval where necessary, and any other pendant matters. This fully resolves all claims of Elza Warti, Multi Rizki, Westhi Ramandina, Mungni Rifki, Muhammad Nur Fuadi, and M. Nuran Tk. Mudo, successors-in-interest and surviving heirs of Rijal Mahdi, which were originally filed in Case No. 19-cv-05842 and reassigned to this Court under Case No. 18-cv-07686.The claims of all other Plaintiffs in Case No. 18-cv-07686 are unaffected by this stipulation. Elza Warti terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 592 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #573 , plintiffs Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni, ErizcoSatya Wicaksono, and Eka Sulistiowati, successors-in-interest and surviving heirs of Mr.Harwinoko, are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement.The Court retains jurisdiction to effectuate settlement, including enforcement,adjudication of liens, approval where necessary, and any other pendant matters. This resolves all claims of Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni, Erizco Satya Wicaksono, and Eka Sulistiowati, successors-in-interest and surviving heirs of Mr. Harwinoko, which were originally filed in Case No. 19-cv-05213 and reassigned to this Court under Case No. 18-cv-07686. The claims of all other Plaintiffs in Case No. 18-cv-07686 are unaffected by this stipulation. Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS.Motion for settlement #589 is granted. Dini Wahyu Wismaningsih terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 590 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dini Wahyu Wismaningsih (Mateo, Mervin)
June 2, 2020 Filing 589 MOTION by Plaintiff Dini Wahyu Wismaningsih for settlement approval (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateo, Mervin)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER: Joint motion for settlement for dismissal of plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements #586 is granted. PUJI LESTARI terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/27/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 587 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff PUJI LESTARI (Scharg, Ari)
May 26, 2020 Filing 586 MOTION by Plaintiff PUJI LESTARI for settlement (Scharg, Ari)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATIONOF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Abdul Rahman terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/21/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATIONOF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Marti Faidah terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/21/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATIONOF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Rosanna Simarmata terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/21/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 581 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Elza Warti, Multi Rizki, Westhi Ramandina, Mungni Rifki, Muhammad Nur Fuadi, and M. Nuran Tk. Mudo's Claims with Prejudice (Scharg, Ari)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATIONOF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. H. Irianto terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/21/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 579 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion by Plaintiff Rini Eka A Soegiyono for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to appoint guardian/attorney ad litem 523 is granted #577 The deadline to file a reply to Plaintiff's motion to appoint a guardian adlitem (Dkt. 523) is extended from May 26, 2020, to June 9, 2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 578 [Proposed] Order by Rini Eka A Soegiyono re: Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply (Noyes, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 577 MOTION by Plaintiff Rini Eka A Soegiyono for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to appoint guardian/attorney ad litem #523 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Noyes, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTIONFOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENTS. Motion for settlement #574 is granted. DANI ANDRIAN terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Main Document 576 replaced on 5/19/2020) (srn, ).
May 19, 2020 Filing 575 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff DANI ANDRIAN (Scharg, Ari)
May 19, 2020 Filing 574 MOTION by Plaintiff DANI ANDRIAN for settlement approval (Scharg, Ari)
May 19, 2020 Filing 573 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Erizvina Marisa Anggraeni, Erizco Satya Wicaksono, and Eka Sulistiowati's Claims with Prejudice (Scharg, Ari)
May 19, 2020 Filing 572 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larson, Bates)
May 18, 2020 Filing 571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Movant's motion to seal document #568 is granted. No appearance is required on 5/20/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to change the text in docket entry #523 to read as follows: MOTION by Plaintiff Rini Soegiyono to appoint Guardian ad litem FOR MINORS-PLAINTIFFS. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/18/2020. Mail Outs notice. (kp, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 569 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of motion to seal document #568 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrmann, Charles)
May 18, 2020 Filing 568 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra to seal document sealed document #567 (Herrmann, Charles)
May 18, 2020 Filing 567 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Ex. 3 to 13.2 (Herrmann, Charles)
May 18, 2020 Filing 566 RESPONSE by Agnes Tjandrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai to appoint Guardian ad litem FOR MINORS-PLAINTIFFS FAHEEMA WIRANOFA AND FAYYAZA WIRANOFA #523 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1.1 to 2.2)(Herrmann, Charles)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER: Joint motion for settlement #563 is granted. All claims of Plaintiffs: SYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as next friend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA,IN RE: LION AIR FLIGHT JT 610 CRASHSYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as nextfriend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA, individually; in Consolidated Case No. 1:18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-01775; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these Plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 564 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann (Herrmann, Charles)
May 13, 2020 Filing 563 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement re Estate of Vicky Ardian (Herrmann, Charles)
May 12, 2020 Filing 562 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #561 , Plaintiff ADITHYA WIRAWAN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of YULIA SILVIANTI, and as next friend of her minor children R.V.A. and Y.H.S, and Defendant, THE BOEING COMPANY, by and through their respective counsels, that Plaintiff's actions are dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a settlement agreement between them. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 561 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larson, Bates)
May 11, 2020 Filing 560 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (20 cv 02643) by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 559 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (20 cv 01775) by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 558 ANSWER to amended complaint by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 557 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #537 , Plaintiff: Andy Fhildyna, individually, and in their capacity as Special Administrator of the Estate of Karmin, and, Defendant, The Boeing Company, by their respective attorneys, Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Andy Fhildyna terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 556 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #538 , Plaintiff Etmidalti, individually, and in their capacity as Special Administrator of the Estate of Shintia Melina, and, Defendant, The Boeing Company, by their respective attorneys, that Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Etmidalti terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 555 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #539 , plaintiff Edwin, individually, and in their capacity as Special Administrator of the Estate of Shella, and, Defendant, The Boeing Company, by their respective attorneys, that Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Edwin Edwin terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting motion of plaintiff Feny, Personal Representative of the heirs of Hendra, to approve minor settlement and dismiss claims with prejudice. Motion for settlement #519 is granted. Feny terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/7/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 553 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 7/7/2020 Boeing is to submit an updated written status report on the number of individual actions remaining. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting motion of plaintiff Marsudi, personal representative of the heirs of cici Ariska, to approve settlement and dismiss claims with prejudice. Motion for settlement #544 is granted. Marsudi (deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/7/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting motion of plaintiff Evi Rahmawati, personal respresentative of the heirs of Dwinanto, to approve minor settlement and dismiss claims with prejudice.Motion for settlement #546 is granted. Evi Rahamwati terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/7/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER Granting motion of plaintiff Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby, Personal Representative of the Heirs of Mardiman, to approve minor settlement and dismiss claims with prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #548 is granted. Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/7/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 549 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby as Exhibit B to motion for settlement approval relating to decedent Mardiman (Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 548 MOTION by Plaintiff Moehammad Zoelfahmi Al-Faraby for settlement approval relating to decedent Mardiman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 547 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Evi Rahamwati as Exhibit B to motion for settlement approval relating to Decedent Dwinanto (Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 546 MOTION by Plaintiff Evi Rahamwati for settlement approval relating to decedent Dwinanto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 545 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Marsudi as Exhibit B to motion for settlement approval relating to Decedent Cici Ariska (Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 544 MOTION by Plaintiff Marsudi for settlement approval relating to Decedent Cici Ariska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wisner, Floyd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 543 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #540 ,Plaintiff Ristuti, individually, and in their capacity as Special Administrator of the Estate of Syahrudin, and, Defendant,The Boeing Company, by their respective attorneys, that Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Ristuti terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 542 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation #541 , Plaintiff Iryun, individually, and in their capacity as Special Administrator of the Estate of Tami Julian, and, Defendant, The Boeing Company, by their respective attorneys, that Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice and without costs according to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Iryun Iryun terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 541 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 540 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 539 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 538 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 537 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 536 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 535 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 534 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 533 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 532 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Plaintiff, Ningsi (Marks, Steven)
May 6, 2020 Filing 531 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Plaintiff, Tuti Chaerani (Marks, Steven)
May 4, 2020 Filing 530 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to reassign case as related #529 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 2643, pending before Judge Gettleman, be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 529 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
May 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF NURDIN'SMOTION TO SEAL. Movant's motion to seal document #526 is granted. No appearance is required on 5/6/2020. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 527 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of motion to seal document, #526 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrmann, Charles)
May 1, 2020 Filing 526 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra to seal document MOTION by Plaintiff Nurdin Rakhman Semendawai to appoint Guardian ad litem FOR MINORS-PLAINTIFFS FAHEEMA WIRANOFA AND FAYYAZA WIRANOFA #523 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Lindquist, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Mark Lindquist)(Herrmann, Charles)
May 1, 2020 Filing 525 STATUS Report on Remaining Individual Actions by The Boeing Company (Shultz, Mack)
April 30, 2020 Filing 524 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By 5/18/2020, any interested party may file a response to plaintiff's motion to appoint guardian/attorney ad litem #523 . Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/26/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 523 MOTION by Plaintiff Rini Soegiyono to appoint Guardian ad litem FOR MINORS-PLAINTIFFS. (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA) Modified on 5/18/2020 (kp, ).
April 27, 2020 Filing 522 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:No status report is required to be filed under any of the case numbers other than the previously ordered status report to be filed by Boeing. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 520 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Feny as Exhibit B to motion for settlement approval relating to Decedent Hendra (Wisner, Floyd)
April 24, 2020 Filing 519 MOTION by Plaintiff Feny for settlement approval relating to Decedent Hendra (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wisner, Floyd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 518 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, Dony Wijaya is dismissed with prejudice. Dony Suhardja Wijaya terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 517 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Plaintiff, Dony Widjaya (Marks, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Joint motion for settlement #507 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement: Joint motion for settlement #508 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 514 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation of dismissal, Lim Des Su is dismissed with prejudice. Lim Des Su terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 513 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Lim Des Su (Wisner, Floyd)
April 21, 2020 Filing 512 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By 5/3/2020 Boeing is to submit a written status report on the number of individual actions remaining. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 511 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration re Estate of Putty Fatikah (Herrmann, Charles)
April 21, 2020 Filing 510 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration re Estate of Arif Yustian (Herrmann, Charles)
April 21, 2020 Filing 509 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann (Herrmann, Charles)
April 21, 2020 Filing 508 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement Estate of ARIF YUSTIAN (Herrmann, Charles)
April 21, 2020 Filing 507 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement Estate of PUTTY FATIKAH RANI (Herrmann, Charles)
April 21, 2020 Filing 506 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, plaintiffs, Ave Noerlina Purba, Defirin and Selviany Purba,are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Selviany Purba, Defirin and Ave Noerlina Purba terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 505 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to stipulation of dismissal, Bayu Saputra is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Bayu Saputra (Personal Representative of the Heirs of, deceased) terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 504 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of the Claims of Plaintiffs Ave Noerlina Puba, Defirin and Selviany Purba (Mateo, Mervin)
April 14, 2020 Filing 503 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims of Plaintiff Bayu Saputra (Wisner, Floyd)
April 13, 2020 Filing 502 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (18-cv-07686 Second Amended Complaint) by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDEr: Joint motion for settlement #490 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER: Joint motion for settlement #489 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER: Joint motion for settlement #492 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER: Joint motion for settlement #491 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/9/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 496 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 495 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 494 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 493 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 492 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement approval and dismissal (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 491 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement approval and dismissal (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 490 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement approval and dismissal (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 489 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement approval and dismissal (Herrmann, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER Approving Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Minor Settlement and Dismissal of Claims with Prejudice. Dony Wijaya terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/8/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Approving Joint Motion of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 481 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dony Wijaya Declaration of Steven C. Marks (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 477 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of TAN TONI (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 476 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of PUTTY FATIKAH RANI (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 475 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of PUTRI YUNIARSI (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 474 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of NATALIA SETIAWAN (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 473 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of MOEDJIONO (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 472 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of MERY YULYANDA (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 471 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of JANNATUN CINTYA DEWI (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 470 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of Dadang (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 469 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of Citra Novita Anggelia Putri (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 468 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of ARIF YUSTIAN (Herrmann, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 467 STIPULATION of Dismissal Estate of ALFIANI HIDAYATUL SOLIKAH (Herrmann, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Filing 466 AMENDED Complaint (Second) (Wisner, Floyd)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/31/2020. Joint Motion for dismissal of plaintiff's claims with prejudice #462 is granted. ZAKIAH (Special Administrator of the Estate of FAIS SALEH HARHARAH, deceased) terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
March 31, 2020 Filing 463 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Zakiah (Mateo, Mervin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 462 MOTION by Plaintiff Zakiah for settlement approval (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateo, Mervin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 461 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' uncontested motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #460 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 460 MOTION by Plaintiff Bayu Saputra for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Wisner, Alexandra)
March 30, 2020 Filing 459 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Boeing Company's motion for reassignment of related case #438 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 1775, Aida v. The Boeing Co., pending before Judge Shah, be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. No appearance is required on 4/6/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
March 30, 2020 Filing 458 RESPONSE by Agnes Tjandrain Support of MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case #438 Notice of Non-opposition of Plaintiffs (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/27/2020. Joint Motion for settlement #450 is granted. TURHINDAYANI (Personal Representative of the Estate of AHMAD MUGHNI, deceased) terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/27/2020. Joint Motion for settlement #449 is granted. NOVIA (Personal Representative of the Estate of DOLAR, deceased) terminated Mailed notice (cn).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/27/2020 dismissing with prejudice claims by Djap Fatimah as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michelle Vergina. Mailed notice (cn).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/27/2020 dismissing with prejudice claims by Djap Fatimah as Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Darryl Bongkal. Mailed notice (cn).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/27/2020 dismissing with prejudice claims by Djap Fatimah as Personal Representative of the Estate of Adonia Magdiel Bongkal. Mailed notice (cn).
March 27, 2020 Filing 452 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 451 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra Declaration of Charles Herrmann (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 450 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Mughni (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 449 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Dolar (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 448 STIPULATION of Dismissal -Estate of Michelle Vergina (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 447 STIPULATION of Dismissal -Estate of Matthew Darryl Bongkal (Herrmann, Charles)
March 27, 2020 Filing 446 STIPULATION of Dismissal -Estate of Adonia Magdiel Bongkal (Herrmann, Charles)
March 23, 2020 Filing 445 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Agreed Motion of The Boeing Company for Extension of Time to Answer #443 is granted. Defendant Boeing Company to file their answer to Plaintiffs' first amended complaint by 5/15/2020. Motion hearing cancelled. CompanyMailed notice (sxw, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 444 Agreed (19-cv-02774) NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #443 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
March 23, 2020 Filing 443 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer Agreed (19-cv-02774) (Larson, Bates)
March 20, 2020 Filing 442 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Santi Amarti Sagala (Marks, Steven)
March 20, 2020 Filing 441 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Muhammad Irfran (Marks, Steven)
March 19, 2020 Filing 440 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Guntur Idil Akbar Bin Misyadi and Dzikri Agung Haryadi Bin Misyadi Claims with Prejudice (Larson, Bates)
March 19, 2020 Filing 439 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #438 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
March 19, 2020 Filing 438 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
March 17, 2020 Filing 436 First AMENDED complaint by Agnes Tjandra against The Boeing Company (Herrmann, Charles)
March 16, 2020 Filing 437 Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.(rbf, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 435 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a first amended complaint #429 is moot. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a first amended complaint #432 is granted without objection. No appearance is required on 3/17/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 434 RESPONSE by Defendant The Boeing Company to motion for leave to file #432 (Larson, Bates)
March 13, 2020 Filing 433 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of motion for leave to file #432 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrmann, Charles)
March 13, 2020 Filing 432 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for leave to file Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Herrmann, Charles)
March 13, 2020 Filing 431 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:On the Court's own motion, the 3/16/2020 notice motion date is stricken. Counsel is directed to re-notice the motion.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 430 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of motion for leave to file #429 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrmann, Charles)
March 11, 2020 Filing 429 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for leave to file Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Herrmann, Charles)
March 10, 2020 Filing 428 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (19-CV-07091) by Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.(Nichols, Shane)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Joint motion for settlement #425 is granted. Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/9/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 426 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi (Scharg, Ari)
March 9, 2020 Filing 425 MOTION by Plaintiff Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi for settlement approval (Scharg, Ari)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Plaintiffs' motion for settlement #420 is granted. Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/4/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 423 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion to approve settlement #381 is granted. No appearance is required on 3/6/2020. Rd Tris Tresnawati terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 422 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion to approve settlement #382 is granted. No appearance is required on 3/6/2020. Tuti Chaerani terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 421 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin (Scharg, Ari)
March 4, 2020 Filing 420 MOTION by Plaintiff Bian Daniaty Binti Udin Zaenudin for settlement approval (Scharg, Ari)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #410 is granted. Septiana Damayanti terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/4/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaitniff's Claims. Joint Motion for settlement #395 is granted. Myrna Julia Sari (Administrator of the Estate of Sekar Maulana, deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice. Joint motion for settlement #399 is granted. Yesenia Fernandez (Administrator of the Estate of Dr. Ibnu Fajariyadi Hantoro, deceased ) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice: Plaintiff's Motion for settlement #401 is granted. Sholekhudin Zuhri (Administrator of the estate of Hesti Nuraini, deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for settlement #403 is granted. Dhina Aldina Saputri (Administrator of the estate of Shandy Johan Ramadhan, deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER Approving Joint Motion For Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims. Plaintiff's Motion for settlement #405 is granted. Adhitya Wirawan (Administrator of the estate of Yulia Silvianti, deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims. Plaintiff's Motion for settlement #397 is granted: Merdian Agustin (Administator of the Estate of Eka Suganda, deceased) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for settlement: Joint motion for dismissal of plaintiff's claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements #393 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 411 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Septiana Damayanti (Scharg, Ari)
March 3, 2020 Filing 410 MOTION by Plaintiff Septiana Damayanti for settlement approval (Scharg, Ari)
February 28, 2020 Filing 409 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #391 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 1346, pending before Judge Bucklo, be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. No appearance is required on 3/3/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 408 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Decedent Nurul Dyah Ayu Sitharesmi (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 407 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Decedent Janu Daryoko (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 406 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Adhitya Wirawan (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 405 MOTION by Plaintiff Adhitya Wirawan for settlement re: Decedent Yulia Silvianti (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 404 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dhina Aldina Saputri (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 403 MOTION by Plaintiff Dhina Aldina Saputri for settlement re: Decedent Shandy Johan Ramadhan (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 402 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff M. Sholekhudin Zuhri (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 401 MOTION by Plaintiff M. Sholekhudin Zuhri for settlement re: Decedent Hesti Nuraini (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 400 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Yesenia Fernandez (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 399 MOTION by Plaintiff Yesenia Fernandez for settlement re: Decedent Ibnu Fajariyadi Hantoro (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 398 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Merdian Agustin (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 397 MOTION by Plaintiff Merdian Agustin for settlement re: Decedent Eka Suganda (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 396 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Myrna Julia Sari (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 395 MOTION by Plaintiff Myrna Julia Sari for settlement re: Decedent Sekar Maulana (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 394 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Wilson Sandi (MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 393 MOTION by Plaintiff Wilson Sandi for settlement re: Decedent Dede Anggraini (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Redacted] ISO Minor Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAZZELLA, ANASTASIA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 392 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #391 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
February 26, 2020 Filing 391 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case as related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
February 24, 2020 Filing 390 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tuti Chaerani (Marks, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 389 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Rd Tris Tresnawati (Marks, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 388 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #382 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 387 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #381 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 386 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:On the Court's own motion, the 2/26/2020 status hearing is vacated and reset for 4/29/2020 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 385 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. and United Technologies' agreed motion for extension of time to 3/10/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #375 is granted. No appearance is required on 2/26/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Joint motion for settlement #379 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/24/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 383 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of the plaintiff Wijaya, the motion for settlement #302 is withdrawn.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 382 MOTION by Plaintiff Tuti Chaerani for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 381 MOTION by Plaintiff Rd Tris Tresnawati for settlement Approval (Marks, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 380 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anice Kasim (Scharg, Ari)
February 21, 2020 Filing 379 MOTION by Plaintiff Anice Kasim for settlement approval (Scharg, Ari)
February 20, 2020 Filing 378 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Technologies Corporation (Nichols, Shane)
February 20, 2020 Filing 377 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. (Nichols, Shane)
February 20, 2020 Filing 376 Agreed (19-CV-07091) NOTICE of Motion by Shane Brian Nichols for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #375 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Nichols, Shane)
February 20, 2020 Filing 375 MOTION by Defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., United Technologies Corporation for extension of time to file answer Agreed (19-cv-07091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Compl.)(Nichols, Shane)
February 19, 2020 Filing 374 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff, Dewi Marlina Manik, Special Administrator of the Estate of Rudi Roni Lumbantoruan's motion to approve settlement #301 is granted. Motion hearing held on 2/19/2020. Dewi Marlina Manik terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 373 Re-Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Andrew T. Hays for presentment of motion for settlement #302 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hays, Andrew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 372 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Counsel may participate telephonically at the 2/19/2020 motion hearing by calling 877-402-9757, access code 4410831. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 371 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation by Gretchen Marie Paine (Paine, Gretchen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 370 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation by Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr (Shultz, Mack)
February 18, 2020 Filing 369 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates)
February 17, 2020 Filing 368 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (1:19-cv-07091) by BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation(Burley, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dewi Marlina Manik (Marks, Steven)
February 17, 2020 Filing 366 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (1:19-cv-07091) by The Boeing Company(Paine, Gretchen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 365 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation (Burley, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 364 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation (Burley, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 363 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation (Burley, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 362 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation (Burley, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 361 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BOEING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING DOMESTIC SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation, BOEING SALES CORPORATION, a Washington State Profit Corporation by Daniel Thomas Burley (Burley, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 360 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Boeing's motion to reassign case as related #358 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 1052, Faidah v. The Boeing Co., be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. No appearance for this motion is required on 2/19/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 359 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #358 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
February 13, 2020 Filing 358 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case as related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
January 30, 2020 Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/22/20 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion hearing (relates to 19 C 1932 and 19 C 1992). Order Number: 37556. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2020. (Renke, Laura)
January 30, 2020 Filing 356 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. and United Technologies' agreed motion for extension of time to 2/25/2020 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. #354 Mailed notice (srn, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 355 Agreed (19-CV-07091) NOTICE of Motion by Shane Brian Nichols for presentment of extension of time #354 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Nichols, Shane)
January 29, 2020 Filing 354 MOTION by Defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., United Technologies Corporation for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - Agreed (19-CV-07091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Compl.)(Nichols, Shane)
January 29, 2020 Filing 353 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Technologies Corporation by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
January 29, 2020 Filing 352 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #325 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #312 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #314 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 348 Motion for settlement #307 is granted; ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #307 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #313 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlements. Movant's motion for settlement #316 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlement. Movant's motion for settlement #308 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlement. Movant's motion for settlement #310 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlement. Movant's motion for settlement #315 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER approving joint motion for dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice and approval of minor settlement. Movant's motion for settlement #309 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Movant's motion for settlement #311 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 340 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion for extension of time to 2/17/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #338 is granted. No appearance is required on 1/30/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 339 (19-cv-07091) NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #338 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/30/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
January 27, 2020 Filing 338 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer (19-cv-07091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Larson, Bates)
January 27, 2020 Filing 337 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 336 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 335 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 334 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 333 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 332 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 331 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 330 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 329 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 328 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 327 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Agnes Tjandra (Herrmann, Charles)
January 27, 2020 Filing 326 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to reassign case #322 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 19 C 7091, currently pending before Judge Rowland, be assigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. No appearance is required on 1/28/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 325 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement Corrected Motion as to Decedent Nurramdhani (Herrmann, Charles)
January 23, 2020 Filing 324 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Considering the large number of settlement documents being submitted in this case, the Court provides the following guidelines to assist counsel seeking approval of a settlement. First, only settlements involving minor children require Court approval under Local Rule 17.1. Settlements not involving minors do not require Court approval, and will be closed upon the filing a stipulation of dismissal. Papers filed seeking approval should clearly state the amount of the settlement and the manner of distribution. These documents should be filed under seal if the parties wish to keep settlement amounts and terms confidential. The Court has found the papers filed by the Herrmann Law Group to clearly and helpfully convey the relevant information. Going forward, settlement approval papers should be prepared similar to the Herrmann Group's papers. Motions for approval submitted in this form may be granted without appearance, and it is not necessary to file a notice of motion. The Court will set a hearing date if necessary.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 323 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion to reassign case #322 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Larson, Bates)
January 23, 2020 Filing 322 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Bates)
January 22, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #301 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
January 22, 2020 Filing 320 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #302 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
January 22, 2020 Filing 319 NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Herrmann for presentment of (Herrmann, Charles)
January 22, 2020 Filing 318 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' motions for settlement #301 #302 are entered and continued generally. Motion hearing held on 1/22/2020. Mailed notice (srn, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 317 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Muhammad Luthfi Nurramdhani (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 316 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Mohamad Fadillah (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 315 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Nicko Yogha Marenta Utama (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 314 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Reo Yumitro (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 313 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Tesa Kausar (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 312 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Verian Utama (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 311 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Maria Ulfah (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 310 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Abdul Khaer (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 309 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Joyo Nuroso (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 308 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Hardy (Herrmann, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 307 MOTION by Movant Agnes Tjandra for settlement and approval of Settlement for Decedent Fifi Hajanto (Herrmann, Charles)
January 9, 2020 Filing 306 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dewi Marlina Manik (Marks, Steven)
January 8, 2020 Filing 305 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dony Wijaya (Marks, Steven)
January 7, 2020 Filing 304 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #301 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/22/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
January 7, 2020 Filing 303 NOTICE of Motion by Steven C. Marks for presentment of motion for settlement #302 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/22/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Marks, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Filing 302 MOTION by Plaintiff Dony Wijaya for settlement Approval (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Filing 301 MOTION by Plaintiff Dewi Marlina Manik for settlement Approval (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
December 30, 2019 Filing 300 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/20/19 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion hearing (relates to 19 C 797). Order Number: 37277. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2020. (Renke, Laura)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation, all of the claims of Lindawati, as personal representative of the Estate of Yunita; Tju Lian Sin, individually; and Tjhin Ai Nit's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation, all of the claims of Deddy Riyanto, as personal representative of the Estate of Vera Junita, and individually; Tjhin Lie Tjhiang, individually; and Djakaria Samsu's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation, all of the claims of Idez Putri Von Ende, as personal representative of the Estate of Trianingsih Putri Van Ende, and individually; and Diwi Sari's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation, all of the claims of Sisfiarsih, as personal representative of the estate of Sastiarta, and individually T. Malaka, individually; and Haryana's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice., Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation, all of the claims of Eni Siti Nuraeni, as personal representative of the estate of Akhmad Endang Rokhmana, and individually; Vitat Tyana Virista, individually; and Muhammad Rizki Fauzy's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER. Pursuant to stipulation,all of plaintiffs Imas Heniyati claims, as personal representative of the Estate of Bambang Rozali Usman, individually, and as mother/guardian of her daughter Salma Rahmathullaili, Maulana Usman, individually, and Farah Fatimah, individually, are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/23/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER: Status hearing held on 12/20/2019. Plaintiff Kurniawati's motion to substitute attorney is granted. #237 It is ordered that attorneys Thomas G. Gardiner, John R. Wrona, and Shannon V. Condon are granted leave to withdraw their appearances on behalf of Fahirida Kurniawati. Attorney James Lessmeister is granted leave to file an appearance on her behalf. Motion by Vini Wulandari to remove Fahrida Kurniawati as Co-Special Adminstrator of the Estate of Harvino is denied. #253 Motion by plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati to remove co-administrator and confirm termination of GKW as attorneys is granted. #255 It is ordered that Vini Wulandari is removed as co-administrator and the firm of Gardiner, Koch, Weisbert & Wrona are hereby terminated. Motion by Fahrida Kurniawati to strike Wulandari's affidavit is granted. #283 No appearance is required on 1/6/2020. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/20/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 292 LETTER from Nia Kurniawati sent through email dated 12/19/2019. (kp, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 291 STIPULATION of Dismissal DEDDY RIYANTO, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VERA JUNITA, and individually; TJHIN LIE TJHIANG, individually; and DJAKARIA SAMSU, individually. (Herrmann, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Filing 290 STIPULATION of Dismissal IDEZ PUTRI VON ENDE as Personal Representative of the Estate of TRIANINGSIH PUTRI VAN ENDE, and individually; and DIWI SARI, individually. (Herrmann, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Filing 289 STIPULATION of Dismissal SISFIARSIH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of SASTIARTA, and individually; T. MALAKA, individually; and HARYANA, individually. (Herrmann, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Filing 288 STIPULATION of Dismissal ENI SITI NURAENI, as Personal Representative of the Estate of AKHMAD ENDANG ROKHMANA, and individually; VITA TYANA VIRISTA, individually; and MUHAMMAD RIZKI FAUZY, individually. (Herrmann, Charles)
December 19, 2019 Filing 287 STIPULATION of Dismissal LINDAWATI, as Personal Representative of the Estate of YUNITA; TJU LIAN SIN, individually; and TJHIN AI NIT, individually. (Herrmann, Charles)
December 19, 2019 Filing 286 STIPULATION of Dismissal IMAS HENIYATI, as Personal Representative of the Estate of BAMBANG ROZALI USMAN, individually, and as mother/guardian of her daughter SALMA RAHMATULLAILI; MAULANA USMAN, individually; and, FARAH FATIMAH, individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Birth Certificate)(Herrmann, Charles)
December 19, 2019 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to consent, attorneys Austin Bartlett, Manuel von Ribbeck, and Monica R. Kelly withdraw their appearances on behalf of Plaintiffs Levina Natascha Subekti and Ave Noerlina Purba, Defirin, and Selviany Purba. Attorney Austin William Bartlett terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE of Motion by James Jacob Lessmeister for presentment of motion to strike #283 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lessmeister, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 283 MOTION by Plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati to strike Wulandari's Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lessmeister, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 282 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Defirin, Ave Noerlina Purba, Selviany Purba, Levina Natascha Subekti CONSENT TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCES ON BEHALF OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS (Bartlett, Austin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 281 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levina Natascha Subekti by Mervin Mateo (Mateo, Mervin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 280 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Defirin, Ave Noerlina Purba, Selviany Purba by Mervin Mateo (Mateo, Mervin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 279 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levina Natascha Subekti by John Patrick Cleary (Cleary, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 278 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Defirin, Ave Noerlina Purba, Selviany Purba by John Patrick Cleary (Cleary, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 277 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to stipulation, all the claims of plaintiff Sutariyo, Personal Representative of the heirs of Asep Sarifudin, deceased, are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to effectuate settlement, including enforcement, adjudication of liens, approval where necessary, and any other pendant matters. Sutariyo (deceased) terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 276 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to stipulation, all the claims of plaintiff Nandang Suratman, Personal Representative of the Heirs of Vivian Afifa, deceased, are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to effectuate settlement, including enforcement, adjudication of liens, approval where necessary, and any other pendant matters. Nandang Suratman terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER on Plaintiff Ningsi, Special Administrator of the Estate of Paul Ferdinand Ayorbaba's Motion to Approve Settlement. Motion to approve settlement #263 is granted. Plaintiffs Levina Natascha Subekti and Ave Noerlina Purba, Defirin and Selviany Purba's motions to substitute attorney #266 #268 are granted is part. Attorneys Mervin Mateo and John C. Cleary are granted leave to file appearances on behalf of those plaintiffs. Current counsel is to inform the Court as to whether they have any objection to the withdrawal of their appearances. Motion hearing held on 12/17/2019. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/17/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 274 REPLY by Plaintiff Fahrida Kurniawati to response in opposition to motion #264 , motion for miscellaneous relief #255 (Lessmeister, James)
December 17, 2019