SALEM v. EGAN
Plaintiff: M JAMES SALEM
Defendant: DIANE EGAN
Case Number: 1:2018cv07708
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Motion hearing held on 1/16/2019. Defendant's motion to vacate the default and extend time to file an answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 2/6/2019. Defendant's motion to transfer case #13 is denied. (rao, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER : The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the following documents: Defendant's motion #10 ; Memorandum in Support #11 ; Defendant's motion to transfer #13 ; and Memorandum in Support #14 . Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/7/2019. Mailed notice. (ek, )
January 6, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by M James Salem in Opposition to motion to set aside judgment, motion to vacate #10 or in the alternative, that an evidentiary hearing be held to determine whether the default was intentional, whether there was good cause for the delay or whether there is a meritorious defense (Salem, M.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Deadra Woods Stokes for presentment of motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Diane Egan in support of motion to transfer case #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Diane Egan to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Deadra Woods Stokes for presentment of motion to set aside judgment, motion to vacate #10 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Diane Egan in support of motion to set aside judgment, motion to vacate #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Diane Egan to set aside judgment , MOTION by Defendant Diane Egan to vacate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Diane Egan)(Stokes, Deadra)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Diane Egan by Deadra Woods Stokes (Stokes, Deadra)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #6 is granted. The Court hereby enters a default against defendant Diane Egan for failure to timely appear, answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. The motion hearing set for 12/26/2018 is stricken. Defendant is given until 1/2/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint and move to vacate this default. If defendant takes no action, then plaintiff is free to notice up a motion for a default judgment including compensatory and punitive damages. (rao, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by M. James Salem for presentment of motion for default judgment #6 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Salem, M.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff M James Salem for default judgment as to Defendant Diane Egan (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons)(Salem, M.)
December 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M James Salem as to Diane Egan on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Salem, M.)
November 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Diane Egan (yt)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
November 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff M JAMES SALEM by M. James Salem (Salem, M.)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Salem, M.)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by M JAMES SALEM; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15197849.(Salem, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALEM v. EGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M JAMES SALEM
Represented By: M. James Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE EGAN
Represented By: Deadra Woods Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?