Patterson et al v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Eva Patterson and Dan Patterson
Defendant: MPC Investment LLC, Speedway LLC and Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv07778
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #24 . Response due by 1/25/2019. Reply due by 2/1/2019. Status Hearing set for 3/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Initial Status hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 9:00 AM stands. Motion hearing set for 1/14/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Zaluzec for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Def MPC Investment LLC's 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Dan Patterson, Eva Pattersonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #24 Plts Response in Opposition to Def MPC Investment LLC's 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss (Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Zaluzec for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Def Marathon Petroleum Corporation's 12(b)(2) Motion)(Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Dan Patterson, Eva Pattersonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #24 with corrected internally-hyperlinked exhibits (Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson re response in opposition to motion, #26 (Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Dan Patterson, Eva Pattersonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #24 Plts Response in Opposition to Def Marathon Petroleum Corporation's 12(b)(2) Motion (Zaluzec, Aaron)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to amended complaint by Speedway LLC(Crawford, Thomas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint at Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Nicole Busey)(Crawford, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #22 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 1/8/2019. Initial Status hearing reset for 2/11/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Crawford, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint,, #20 (Zaluzec, Aaron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 First AMENDED complaint by Eva Patterson, Dan Patterson against MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Zaluzec, Aaron)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC re status report #18 (Crawford, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC (Crawford, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiffs' Motion to amend/correct Complaint #15 is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 is stricken without prejudice to be presented again if the Amended Complaint does not correct the defects. Motion hearing set for 12/19/2018 is stricken. Initial Status hearing set for 12/20/2018 is reset for 1/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 Rule 15(a)(1)(B) Request for Leave to Amend Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Zaluzec for presentment of motion to amend/correct, #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Zaluzec, Aaron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiffs Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 , answer to complaint #7 , notice of removal,, #1 , set motion a #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1)(B) (Zaluzec, Aaron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson re MOTION by Plaintiffs Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 , answer to complaint #7 , notice of removal,, #1 , set motion a #13 Notice of Plaintiff's Filing its Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1)(B) (Zaluzec, Aaron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Filing by Plaintiffs Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 , answer to complaint #7 , notice of removal,, #1 , set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, set deadlines/hearings, #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1)(B) (Zaluzec, Aaron) Modified on 12/12/2018 (lk, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC by Joseph P Sullivan (Sullivan, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 10:00 AM. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Mailed notice (lk, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 . Response due by 12/17/2018. Reply due by 12/31/2018. Status Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 9:00 AM. Initial Status hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 9:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Crawford, Thomas)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Speedway LLC Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand (Crawford, Thomas)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Speedway LLC(Crawford, Thomas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dan Patterson, Eva Patterson by Aaron Zaluzec (Zaluzec, Aaron)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC by Faredin Ameti (Ameti, Faredin)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC by Thomas M. Crawford (Crawford, Thomas)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-010930) filed by MPC Investment LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Speedway LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15208173. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint at Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas M. Crawford, #3 Exhibit Division of Corporation - Filings, #4 Exhibit Division of Corporation - Filings, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Removal - Diversity)(Crawford, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson et al v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Patterson
Represented By: Aaron Zaluzec
Represented By: Aaron N Zaluzec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Patterson
Represented By: Aaron Zaluzec
Represented By: Aaron N Zaluzec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPC Investment LLC
Represented By: Faredin Ameti
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Joseph P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Faredin Ameti
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Joseph P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Faredin Ameti
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Joseph P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?