Seterus Inc v. Folkerts et al

Appellee: Dennis A Folkerts and Janet L Folkerts
Appellant: Seterus Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv07800
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 FINAL closing order dated 12/10/2018 entered on USBC docket. (aee, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Appellant's unopposed motion to dismiss the appeal #5 is granted. This case is hereby dismissed and each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The agreed motion for consolidation pursuant to Rule 42(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #3 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/10/2018. Mailed notice (aee, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Appellant Seterus Inc to dismiss appeal (UNOPPOSED) (Karek, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas W. Toolis for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #3 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/18/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Toolis, Thomas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by Appellees Dennis A Folkerts, Janet L Folkerts to consolidate cases 18-cv-7800 and 18-cv-7801 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Toolis, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (aee, )
November 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 15B25468 (Judge Hollis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seterus Inc v. Folkerts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis A Folkerts
Represented By: Thomas W. Toolis
Represented By: John A Reed
Represented By: Jacqueline Diane Opyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janet L Folkerts
Represented By: Thomas W. Toolis
Represented By: John A Reed
Represented By: Jacqueline Diane Opyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Seterus Inc
Represented By: Ernest Paul Wagner
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Karek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?