Seterus Inc. v. Folkerts et al

Appellee: Janet L. Folkerts and Dennis A. Folkerts
Appellant: Seterus Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07801
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 FINAL closing order #6 dated 12/18/2018 entered on USBC docket. (kp, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to dismiss #4 is granted. This case is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Thomas Karek for presentment of motion to dismiss #4 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Karek, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Appellant Seterus Inc. to dismiss appeal (UNOPPOSED) (Karek, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/29/18. (smm, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to to all counsel of record (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) Letter, #2 Attorney Appearance Form).(smm)
November 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 15B25468 (Judge Hollis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seterus Inc. v. Folkerts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janet L. Folkerts
Represented By: Jacqueline Diane Opyd
Represented By: Thomas W. Toolis
Represented By: John A Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis A. Folkerts
Represented By: Jacqueline Diane Opyd
Represented By: Thomas W. Toolis
Represented By: John A Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Seterus Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Karek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?