Taylor v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Trudy Taylor
Defendant: Gerald Beimler, Brian Ali, Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Local School Council for Aldridge Elementary School, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Ryan Crosby, Ronald Marmer, Elizabeth Kirby, Karen Saffold, Local School Council for Jesse Owens Elementary Community Academy, Forrest Claypool, Thomas Krieger, Felicia Sanders, Janice Jackson, State of Illinois and James Ciesil
Case Number: 1:2018cv07874
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Sixth AMENDED complaint by Trudy Taylor against Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Karen Saffold (Onyango, Eric)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trudy Taylor by Maudia Diana Victorian Norman Washington (Norman Washington, Maudia)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago by Elizabeth Kathleen Barton (Barton, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 12/17/2018. Amended complaint to be filed by 1/24/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are due by 1/24/2019. Answer to amended complaint to be filed by 2/21/2019. Status hearing is set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for clarification and extension of time #5 is terminated as moot based on the Court's rulings at today's status hearing. (mk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY by Defendants Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Karen Saffold to motion to clarify, motion for extension of time to file answer #5 (Jaremus, Christina)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Trudy Taylor to motion to clarify, motion for extension of time to file answer #5 (Onyango, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jane Best for presentment of motion to clarify, motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/18/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Best, Susan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Karen Saffold to clarify , MOTION by Defendants Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Karen Saffold for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Best, Susan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS Report JOINT by Board of Education of the City of Chicago (Best, Susan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case having been severed from Case No. 16-cv-8668 and having been reassigned to Judge Kennelly, a status hearing is set for 12/17/2018 at 9:30 AM. By no later than 12/12/2018, the parties are to file a joint status report giving a brief summary of each claim and defense; describing the status of discovery, including what discovery has been done and what exactly remains to be done; and discussing the history and status of any discussions regarding settlement. (mk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDED complaint by Trudy Taylor against Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Karen Saffold and Scholastic, Inc. (kp, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/28/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Beimler
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ali
Represented By: Christina Jaremus
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Represented By: Christina Jaremus
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local School Council for Aldridge Elementary School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Brink
Represented By: Steven Richard Rogovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Crosby
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Marmer
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kirby
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Saffold
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local School Council for Jesse Owens Elementary Community Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Claypool
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Krieger
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Sanders
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Jackson
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ciesil
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Taylor
Represented By: Daniel Walker, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Carlos Onyango
Represented By: Maudia Diana Victorian Norman Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?