Rainey Circuit LLC v. Twitter, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rainey Circuit LLC
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07905
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The agreed motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 2/25/2019. No appearance on the motion is required. The initial status conference is reset to 3/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report due 3/5/19. The parties are reminded to file the executed summons or waiver of service on the docket. Mailed notice (air, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Rainey Circuit LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The agreed motion for extension of time #6 is granted. Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 1/24/2019. No appearance on the motion is required. This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/7/19. The parties are further directed to file the executed summons or waiver of service on the docket. Mailed notice (air, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Rainey Circuit LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
November 30, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Twitter, Inc. (jjr, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rainey Circuit LLC by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (rp, )
November 30, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rainey Circuit LLC by Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Matuszewski, Kenneth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rainey Circuit LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15230778. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matuszewski, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainey Circuit LLC v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainey Circuit LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?