Wheeler Financial Inc v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Appellee: Ramon Aguirre, Bertha B Aguirre and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Appellant: Wheeler Financial Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv07915
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 04/25/2017, 09/18/2018, and 11/13/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #5 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Agreed Motion of Appellant to Suspend Briefings Schedule #9 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 25, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by David Richard Doyle for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Doyle, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Appellant Wheeler Financial Inc Agreed Motion of Appellant to Suspend Briefing Schedule (Doyle, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 AGREED ORDER Granting Agreed Motion Of Appellant To Suspend Briefing Schedule Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on January 22, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 02/22/2017 & 03/21/2017 regarding Notice of Appeal #5 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Wheeler Financial Inc (Doyle, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on October 9, 2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 (Rule 8010(3))) (ph, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Brian W. Hockett (Hockett, Brian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Robert F. Rabin (Rabin, Robert)
November 30, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (pj, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 14B24420 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler Financial Inc v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ramon Aguirre
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Penelope Noami Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bertha B Aguirre
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Penelope Noami Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert F. Rabin
Represented By: Brian W. Hockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wheeler Financial Inc
Represented By: David Richard Doyle
Represented By: Robert Michael Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?