Fund Recovery Services, LLC. v. Alaimo et al

Appellee: April D. Johnson, Michael P. Bailey, Jerardo Prado, Brittney Gale Alaimo, Mia Victoria I. Rocello, Sharon S. Tatumausbie, Christina Alston, Jennifer J. Solorio, Latonya D. Kitchen, Alejandro Camacho and Anitra Aytman Billops
Appellant: Fund Recovery Services, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07969
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 11/8/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 3/22/18, 5/10/18, 7/17/18, 9/18/18 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Appellant's motion to suspend the Court's briefing schedule #5 is granted. Briefing of the bankruptcy appeal is suspended until further order of the Court. Motion hearing set for 1/3/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (cn).
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Peter John Roberts for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Roberts, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC.To Suspend Briefing Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Roberts, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC. by Peter John Roberts (Roberts, Peter)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, the appellant shall serve and file the opening brief by 1/3/2019. The appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 2/4/2019. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 2/18/2019. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 LR 83.16 letter)(rp, )
December 4, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 B 39654 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 Bk Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fund Recovery Services, LLC. v. Alaimo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: April D. Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael P. Bailey
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerardo Prado
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brittney Gale Alaimo
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mia Victoria I. Rocello
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sharon S. Tatumausbie
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christina Alston
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jennifer J. Solorio
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Latonya D. Kitchen
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alejandro Camacho
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anitra Aytman Billops
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fund Recovery Services, LLC.
Represented By: Peter John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?