Marquez v. RCKC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Norma Marquez
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation, Connz Corp., Conn Group Inc., Randy Conn, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, Konnz Corporation, RKMK Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC, Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation and Zeeken Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv07977
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, and Zeeken Corporations unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due 2/8/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: McDonald's defendants' unopposed motion #5 to extend time to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC and McDonald's Corporation's responsive pleading due by 2/8/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC by Andrew Nicholas Fiske (Fiske, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Martin K. LaPointe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #11 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (LaPointe, Martin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, Zeeken Corporation for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (LaPointe, Martin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, Zeeken Corporation by David Erik Stevens (Stevens, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, Zeeken Corporation by Yee-ling Angela Lam (Lam, Yee-ling)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, Zeeken Corporation by Martin K. LaPointe (LaPointe, Martin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mark L. Shapiro for presentment of extension of time #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/15/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Shapiro, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC by Phillip Michael Schreiber (Schreiber, Phillip)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC for extension of time to Answer or Move - Unopposed (Shapiro, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC by Mark L. Shapiro (Shapiro, Mark)
December 6, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Randy Conn, Conn Group Inc., Connz Corp., Jacmar Corporation, Kenzcon Corporation, Konnz Corporation, McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC, R. K. Kenzie Corporation, RCKC Corporation, RKMK Corporation, Zeeken Corporation (mc, )
December 4, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norma Marquez by Jeffrey Grant Brown (Brown, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norma Marquez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15243028. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent forms)(Brown, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. RCKC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Phillip Michael Schreiber
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Fiske
Represented By: Mark L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connz Corp.
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Group Inc.
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Conn
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. K. Kenzie Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCKC Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konnz Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RKMK Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's USA, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Michael Schreiber
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Fiske
Represented By: Mark L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacmar Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenzcon Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeeken Corporation
Represented By: Martin K. LaPointe
Represented By: Yee-ling Angela Lam
Represented By: David Erik Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Marquez
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?