Wynter v. Nicholson et al

Petitioner: David Wynter
Respondent: Walter Nicholson
Case Number: 1:2018cv07987
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED, for document #6 sent to David Wynter returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to N-04231, Stateville-STV, P.O. Box 112, Joliet, IL 60434 (lma, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by February 20, 2019. Petitioner shall reply by March 8, 2019. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to update the docket to reflect that Respondent Walter Nicholson is the Warden of the Stateville Correctional Center. (See Statement). Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/4/2019. Mailed notice(yap, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioner David Wynter for attorney representation. (aee, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner David Wynter for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (aee, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Walter Nicholson against David Wynter (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 11/27/18) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aee, ) Modified on 1/7/2019 (lf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynter v. Nicholson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Wynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?