Shah v. Hart

Petitioner: Vivek Shah
Respondent: Richard Hartman and Richard Hart
Case Number: 1:2018cv07990
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 15 NOTICE by Vivek Shah of Change of Address (Shah, Vivek)
January 8, 2019 14 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/8/2019. Civil case closed.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/8/2019. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The five-dollar filing fee is waived. For the reasons stated below, the habeas corpus petition #1 is dismissed as an unauthorized second and successive 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion. A certificate of appealability will not issue. Enter judgment order. Civil case closed. Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER: Petitioner's emergency motion for a temporary restraining order seeking his immediate release #6 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/3/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 3, 2019 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Notion hearing held on 1/3/2019. After brief oral arguments on Petitioner's verified emergency motion for immediate release of petitioner under the First Step Act #6 , the Court shall take the matter under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 29, 2018 10 EXHIBIT by Petitioner Vivek Shah regarding MOTION by Petitioner Vivek Shah for temporary restraining order VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE OF PETITIONER UNDER THE FIRST STEP ACT #6 (Shah, Vivek)
December 28, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On further consideration, and in light of the intervening holidays and ongoing partial government shutdown, the previously entered response deadline is stricken. The government is to be prepared to provide brief oral argument on the merits of the petitioner's emergency motion at the hearing set for 1/3/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 27, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On the petitioner's emergency motion for immediate release under the First Step Act #6 , the government's response is due by 12/31/2018. An expedited hearing on that motion is set for 1/3/2019 at 9:15 AM in courtroom 1425. These dates are the soonest that this Court believes are practicable in light of the holidays, the impact of a partial government shutdown, the unexpected nature of the petitioner's filing, and the lack of information presently available regarding the petitioner's status. The Court requests that the government ensure that a probation officer is present at the motion hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 27, 2018 7 DECLARATION of Vivek Shah regarding motion for temporary restraining order #6 (Shah, Vivek) (Linked document contains incorrect case number) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 12/28/2018 (bg, ).
December 22, 2018 6 MOTION by Petitioner Vivek Shah for temporary restraining order VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE OF PETITIONER UNDER THE FIRST STEP ACT (Shah, Vivek)
December 6, 2018 5 PRO SE Appearance by Petitioner Vivek Shah (bg, )
December 4, 2018 4 BRIEF by Vivek Shah in support of petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Exhibit) (bg, )
December 4, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Vivek Shah for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
December 4, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
December 4, 2018 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus and no copies filed by Vivek Shah Hartman (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vivek Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?