Reynaud v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Juliet Reynaud
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08017
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/16/2019. Mailed notice(ber, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of a Qualified Protective Order Pursuant to HIPAA #16 is granted. Enter Order. The motion hearing noticed for 1/31/19 is stricken with no appearance required. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Edward Khatskin for presentment of motion for protective order #16 before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/31/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Khatskin, Edward)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. for protective order Unopposed (Khatskin, Edward)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for the purposes of discovery supervision and to conduct a settlement conference. Initial status hearing scheduled for 2/5/19 at 10:30 a.m. An initial status report is not required. Prior to the status hearing, however, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Initial Status Report and his Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. The parties shall proceed in accordance with the proposed discovery plan contained in their initial status report #10 including with respect to the initiation of written discovery on or before 2/2/19 (30 days from filing of that report). Mailed notice (ber, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 1/8/2019. Discovery ordered closed by 9/18/2019. Status hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement. (cn). Mailed notice.
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Appearance by Juliet Reynaud Attorney Courtney Anderson (Kolb, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juliet Reynaud by John Paul Kolb (Kolb, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Juliet Reynaud (Kolb, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Set/reset hearings Status hearing set for 1/3/2019 is stricken and re-set to 1/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The joint status report is to be filed and a courtesy copy delivered to chambers by 1/2/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: A joint status report is to be filed and a courtesy copy delivered to chambers by 12/27/2018. Status hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(Khatskin, Edward)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. regarding notice of removal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Khatskin, Edward)
December 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. by Ronald E Neroda (Neroda, Ronald)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. by Edward Khatskin (Khatskin, Edward)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Khatskin, Edward)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2018L011584) filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15249281. (Khatskin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynaud v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Reynaud
Represented By: Courtney Renee Anderson
Represented By: John Paul Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Khatskin
Represented By: Ronald E Neroda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?