Blackmon v. BMJ Investment Group Inc.

Plaintiff: Kortez Lamont Blackmon
Defendant: BMJ Investment Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08021
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 MAILED an amended complaint and an order dated 1/7/2019 to plaintiff Kortez Blackmon. (ek, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : Plaintiff Kortez Blackmon, pro se, seeks permission in forma pauperis ("IFP") in this suit. Because plaintiff does not have sufficient funds to pay the filing fee, his IFP application #4 is granted. However, plaintiff's allegations are not sufficient to survive the Court's initial screening, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by January 28, 2019, if he wishes to pursue this matter and can state a claim in compliance with this Order and with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/7/2019. Mailed notice.(ek, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kortez Lamont Blackmon for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Kortez Lamont Blackmon (ek, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ek, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Kortez Lamont Blackmon (ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. BMJ Investment Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kortez Lamont Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMJ Investment Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?