Abrams v. Kaminski (Male) et al

Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Defendant: Crawford (Male) and Kaminski (Male)
Case Number: 1:2018cv08031
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT by Edward Abrams. (ew, )
January 15, 2019 MAILED Copy of Order dated 1/15/19 to Supervisor of Inmate trust fund account at Pontiac Correctional Facility (nsf, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $0.83 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court denies Plaintiff's requests for a waiver of fees on state-court forms. [6, 8] The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must explain in writing why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to accurately disclose his litigation history. Failure to do so by February 26, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this matter. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/15/2019. Mailed notice (nsf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER Trust Fund Account Statement with letter dated 1/2/2019 by Edward Abrams. (ek, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (cc, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (kp, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (cc, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 12/21/1. (cc, )
December 7, 2018 MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order #4 to Plaintiff. (kp, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding his filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 11, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Edward Abrams (Exhibits) (ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Kaminski (Male) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford (Male)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaminski (Male)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?