Abrams v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Defendant: Tom Dart and Cook County Jail
Case Number: 1:2018cv08033
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 RECEIVED Amended Complaint by Edward Abrams. (Exhibits) (jh, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 1/17/2019. (jh, )
January 15, 2019 MAILED Copy of Order dated 1/15/19 w/Amended Complaint Form and Instructions to Edward Abrams - Pontiac Correctional Center (gcy, )
January 15, 2019 MAILED Mailed certified copy of Order dated 1/15/19 to Trust Fund Officer - Pontiac Correctional Center. (gcy, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis based on his trust fund statement. #15 The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $1.14 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. Because Plaintiff's amended complaint #8 raises unrelated claims, it is stricken without prejudice to Plaintiff re-filing it in a new case. he Court denies, as stale or as submitted on improper forms, Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and state-court applications/orders for waivers of fees. [9, 12, 14] Plaintiff's motions for a copy of prior orders or for an extension of time (the latter of which is incorrectly docketed as a motion for attorney representation) [11, 13] are denied as moot. For the reasons stated in this order, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint #1 without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. If he wants to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must do two things: (1) explain in writing why this case should not be dismissed due to Plaintiffs failure to accurately disclose his litigation history; and (2) submit an amended complaint that states a cognizable federal claim against a proper defendant or defendants in light of the principles discussed in this order. Failure to fully comply with this order by February 26, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this matter. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff an amended complaint and instructions, along with a copy of this order. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's motions for attorney representation [4, 10] pending the submission a response and an amended complaint. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/15/2019. Mailed Notice.(gcy, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 1/2/19. (Attachment). (gcy, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for attorney representation. (jh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams requesting all Orders. (jh, )
December 11, 2018 MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Order dated 12/11/2018 to the Plaintiff. (jh, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed, properly completed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding his filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 11, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/11/2018. Mailed notice (jh, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for attorney representation. (jh, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 RECEIVED Amended Complaint by Edward Abrams. (Exhibits) (jh, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from Edward Abrams. (jh, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Edward Abrams. (Exhibits) (jh, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for attorney representation. (jh, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint by Edward Abrams. (Exhibits) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?