Piper v. AT&S Americas, LLC

Plaintiff: Catherine Piper
Defendant: AT&S Americas, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08046
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 15 RESPONSE by AT&S Americas, LLCin Support of MOTION by Defendant AT&S Americas, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 (Rooney, Arthur)
January 6, 2019 14 RESPONSE by Catherine Piperin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AT&S Americas, LLCRequest for Judicial Notice #11 , MOTION by Defendant AT&S Americas, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 (Liston, John)
December 19, 2018 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #9 and #11 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 1/10/2019. Defendant to reply by 1/24/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 12/20/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 14, 2018 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by AT&S Americas, LLC (Rooney, Arthur)
December 14, 2018 11 MOTION by Defendant AT&S Americas, LLCRequest for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit IDHR FOIA Request, #4 Exhibit IDHR FOIA Response)(Rooney, Arthur)
December 14, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM by AT&S Americas, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #9 (Rooney, Arthur)
December 14, 2018 9 MOTION by Defendant AT&S Americas, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Rooney, Arthur)
December 14, 2018 8 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur James Rooney for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Rooney, Arthur)
December 12, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Catherine Piper by John Michael Liston (Liston, John)
December 11, 2018 6 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
December 7, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
December 7, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&S Americas, LLC by Melissa Anne Logan (Logan, Melissa)
December 7, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&S Americas, LLC by Arthur James Rooney (Rooney, Arthur)
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rooney, Arthur)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018CH12799) filed by AT&S Americas, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15253686. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Summons)(Rooney, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper v. AT&S Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&S Americas, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Anne Logan
Represented By: Arthur James Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Piper
Represented By: John Michael Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?