Garcia v. Wray

Plaintiff: ROSE E. GARCIA
Defendant: DONNA WRAY
Case Number: 1:2018cv08047
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 15 ENTERED JUDGMENT. (mgh, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/21/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 21, 2018 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status and motion hearing held on 12/21/2018. Plaintiff failed to appear. Defendant's motion to dismiss #9 and Defendants motion to vacate State Court Order entered after Removal of Case to Federal Court #11 are granted. Enter Order. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 17, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Ernest Yi Ling for presentment of motion to vacate #11 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Ling, Ernest)
December 17, 2018 11 MOTION by Defendant Donna Wray to vacate State Court Order Entered After Removal of Case to Federal Court (Ling, Ernest)
December 14, 2018 10 NOTICE of Motion by Ernest Yi Ling for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Ling, Ernest)
December 14, 2018 9 MOTION by Defendant Donna Wray to dismiss (Ling, Ernest)
December 13, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing set for 12/21/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 10, 2018 7 STATEMENT by Rose E. Garcia (tt, )
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
December 10, 2018 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
December 7, 2018 4 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant DONNA WRAY (Ling, Ernest)
December 7, 2018 3 NOTICE by DONNA WRAY of Filing Notice of Removal (Ling, Ernest)
December 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of County, Illinois, case number (18 OP 78729) filed by DONNA WRAY Ex. A: State court documents (Ling, Ernest)
December 7, 2018 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ling, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE E. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA WRAY
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?