Bolton v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Christine Ann Bolton
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv08053
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The government is directed to file the administrative record by March 14, 2019. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by May 14, 2019. The government's response and/or cross-motion for summary judgment is due by July 15, 2019. If Plaintiff believes that a reply is necessary, the reply brief must be filed by July 29, 2019, but one is not required. Mailed notice (ma,)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/26/2018. (ew, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The 1/22/2019 status hearing #8 is stricken. This case is forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment to the Magistrate Judge. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Ling, Ernest)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Ann Bolton; (las, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Initial status hearing set for 1/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. By 1/15/2019, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/10/18.(las, )
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Ann Bolton by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Ann Bolton by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Ann Bolton by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christine Ann Bolton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Christine Ann Bolton; (Spector, Deborah) Modified on 12/10/2018 (las, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ann Bolton
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?