Singleton v. Amita Health

Plaintiff: Rashun Singleton
Defendant: Amita Health
Case Number: 1:2018cv08064
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/23/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/23/2019. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #11 is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and for the reasons stated below, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The 2/28/2019 status hearing #13 is stricken. Enter judgment order. Civil case closed.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 2/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of FMLA Claim by Rashun Singleton against Amita Health; (Attachments). (smm, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Rashun Singleton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, )
December 12, 2018 MAILED an in forma pauperis application form along with this order dated 12/11/18 to Plaintiff Rashun Singleton. (smm, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #9 is denied for failure to answer Questions 2.B, 10, and 11. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application form along with this order. Plaintiff has until 1/7/2019 to file a complete in forma papueris application form. In addition, Plaintiff by 1/7/2019 shall file a memorandum showing cause why this suit is not barred by the settlement that was enforced in Singleton v. Amita Health, No. 17 C 4514 (N.D. Ill.). If Plaintiff does not comply with both of these obligations by 1/7/2019, this case will be summarily dismissed. Status hearing set for 1/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) Modified on 12/12/2018 (smm, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding APPLICATION by Plaintiff Rashun Singleton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . (smm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Rashun Singleton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ENTERED in Error. (smm, ) Modified on 12/10/2018 (smm, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Rashun Singleton. (smm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Rashun Singleton. (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Amita Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amita Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashun Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?