Edwards v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Demond Edwards
Defendant: Thomas Dart and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2018cv08077
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Marie Mcelroy for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mcelroy, Lisa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart for extension of time Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Mcelroy, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 WITHDRAWING Kathleen Murphy as counsel for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart and substituting Monica Gutowski as counsel of record (Gutowski, Monica)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 WITHDRAWING Kathleen Murphy as counsel for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart and substituting Brian Patrick Gainer as counsel of record (Gainer, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 WITHDRAWING Kathleen Murphy as counsel for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart and substituting Lisa Marie Mcelroy as counsel of record (Mcelroy, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 WITHDRAWING Kathleen Murphy as counsel for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart and substituting Ahmed A Kosoko as counsel of record (Kosoko, Ahmed)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 28, 2018. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 3/18/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Murphy for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Kathleen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Murphy, Kathleen)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart by Kathleen Murphy (Murphy, Kathleen)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demond Edwards as to All Defendants. (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart (cc, )
December 10, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (lma, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Demond Edwards by Thomas Gerard Morrissey (Morrissey, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Demond Edwards by Patrick William Morrissey (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Demond Edwards; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15257508.(Morrissey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Ahmed A Kosoko
Represented By: Kathleen Murphy
Represented By: Monica Gutowski
Represented By: Lisa Marie Mcelroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Ahmed A Kosoko
Represented By: Kathleen Murphy
Represented By: Monica Gutowski
Represented By: Lisa Marie Mcelroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond Edwards
Represented By: Patrick William Morrissey
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?